blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0969794 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0969794



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 63
14.02.2002 Closing of application Search / examination 3
02.11.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
15.05.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
15.05.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.01.2000 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
17.01.2000 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
17.01.2000 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
06.01.2000 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
20.12.1999 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
13.12.1999 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
01.12.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
25.11.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.11.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.09.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
29.12.1998 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
11.12.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
17.09.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 30