blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0969794


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.02.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  03.04.2002  [2002/14]
30.10.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn
11.05.2001 First examination report
10.05.2001 Examination report or reply
13.03.2001 Renewal fee
17.03.2000 Renewal fee
25.02.2000 Change - inventor published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
04.02.2000 Change - inventor published on  22.03.2000 [2000/12]
26.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]
26.11.1999 Request for examination filed published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]
22.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
19.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
18.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
08.10.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
06.10.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
06.10.1999 Renewal fee
30.12.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
05.11.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
17.04.1997 PCT data prior to European publication