blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0969794
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO9840046Global Dossier 03.12.1998A3
WO9840046 17.09.1998A2
Priority number Date
US9703564 10.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0969794Global Dossier 12.01.2000A2
Priority number Date
US9703564 10.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2071897 29.09.1998A
Priority number Date
US9703564 10.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9715043 22.05.2001A
Priority number Date
BR9715043 10.03.1997
US9703564 10.03.1997