Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969794

EP0969794 - HAIR CONDITIONING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.02.2002
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.04.2002  [2002/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MITSUMATSU, Arata
304-34-3 Sannocho Nishinomiya
City Hyogo 662-0018 / JP
02 / NAKAMURA, Kiichiro
1-10-101-3702, Koyo-cho Naka
Higashinada-ku Kobe 658-0032 / JP
[2000/15]
Former [2000/12]01 / MITSUMATSU, Arata
7-33-203, Asahigaoka-cho
Ashiya Hyogo 659 / JP
02 / NAKAMURA, Kiichiro
1-10-101-3702, Koyo-cho Naka
Higashinada-ku Kobe 658-0032 / JP
Former [2000/02]01 / MITSUMATSU, Arata
7-33-203, Asahigaoka-cho
Ashiya Hyogo 659 / JP
02 / NAKAMURA, Kiichiro
1-10-101-2711, Koyo-cho Naka
Higashinada-ku Kobe 658 / JP
Representative(s)McKinney, Victoria , et al
Procter & Gamble
Technical Centers Limited
Lovett House
Lovett Road
Staines, Middlesex TW18 3AZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Woof, Victoria , et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centers Limited, Lovett House, Lovett Road
Staines, Middlesex TW18 3AZ / GB
Application number, filing date97908931.510.03.1997
[2000/02]
WO1997US03564
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9840046
Date:17.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/37]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969794
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/06
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:HAARPFLEGEMITTEL[2000/02]
English:HAIR CONDITIONING COMPOSITIONS[2000/02]
French:COMPOSITIONS POUR APRES-SHAMPOOINGS[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase27.09.1999National basic fee paid 
27.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
15.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.09.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/14]
02.11.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]DE4232506  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-12 * examples B1-B11,1-2 *;
 JPH02160714  [ ] (KANEBO LTD);
 [A]WO9520939  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0562639  (CURTIS HELENE IND INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [A]  - STN File Supplier, Karlsruhe, DE, File, XP002046285 [A] 1-12 * Chemical Abstracts, vol 113, AN=217792 see the abstract *