Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1006986

EP1006986 - PERSONAL CARE COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING A COPOLYMER HAVING HYDROPHOBIC, CARBON-BASED GRAFTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  13.09.2002
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 09.12.2009  [2009/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/24]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MIDHA, Sanjeev
Apartment 2D 9247 Deercross Parkway
Blue Ash, OH 45236 / US
02 / SCHRAER, Robert, Michael
6072 Monastery Drive
Fairfield, OH 45014 / US
03 / TORGERSON, Peter, Marte
4127 US 35 N.W.
Washington Court House, OH 43160 / US
[2000/24]
Representative(s)McKinney, Victoria , et al
Procter & Gamble
Technical Centers Limited
Lovett House
Lovett Road
Staines, Middlesex TW18 3AZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/50]McKinney, Victoria , et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centers Limited Lovett House, Lovett Road
Staines, Middlesex TW18 3AZ / GB
Former [2000/24]Woof, Victoria , et al
Procter & Gamble (Health & Beauty Care) Limited, Lovett House, Lovett Road
Staines, Middlesex TW18 3AZ / GB
Application number, filing date97908948.905.03.1997
[2000/24]
WO1997US03609
Priority number, dateUS1996061640115.03.1996         Original published format: US 616401
[2000/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9733558
Date:18.09.1997
Language:EN
[1997/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1006986
Date:14.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.1997
[2000/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.09.1997
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/06
[2000/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/24]
TitleGerman:KÖRPERPFLEGEMITTEL AUS COPOLYMER MIT AUFGEPFROPFTEN, HYDROPHOBEN GRUPPEN AUF KOHLENSTOFFBASIS[2000/24]
English:PERSONAL CARE COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING A COPOLYMER HAVING HYDROPHOBIC, CARBON-BASED GRAFTS[2000/24]
French:COMPOSITION DE PRODUITS DE SOINS PERSONNELS CONTENANT UN COPOLYMERE PRESENTANT DES GREFFES HYDROPHOBES A BASE DE CARBONE[2000/24]
Entry into regional phase25.09.1998National basic fee paid 
25.09.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
25.09.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.10.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.09.1998Examination requested  [2000/24]
10.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
29.05.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/44]
08.06.2002Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200004   M06   Fee paid on   21.06.2000
31.03.200206   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[E]US5632998  (MIDHA SANJEEV [US], et al) [E] 1-8 * column 2, line 29 - column 12, line 53 * * column 14, line 12 - line 28 *;
 [A]WO9115187  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 30 * * page 8, line 25 - page 10, line 14 *;
 [A]WO9216187  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,5 * claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9600562  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1-3 *;
 [PA]WO9620691  (ISP INVESTMENTS INC [US]) [PA] 1 * page 5, line 1 - page 7, line 17 *;
 [A]GB2144133  (OREAL)