Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0885529

EP0885529 - LIST CONTROLLED VIDEO OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.04.2001
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.04.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.05.2001 [2001/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PowerTV, Inc.
Suite 100, 20833 Stevens Creek Boulevard
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
[1998/52]
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Jiann-Tsuen
3984 West Rincon Avenue
Campbell, CA 95008 / US
02 / MacINNIS, Alexander, G.
121 Windsor Drive
San Carlos, CA 94070 / US
03 / MORSE, Ken
658 Portofino Lane
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
[1998/52]
Representative(s)Kügele, Bernhard , et al
Novagraaf International SA
Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / CH
[N/P]
Former [1998/52]Kügele, Bernhard , et al
NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais
1202 Genève / CH
Application number, filing date97908963.805.03.1997
[1998/52]
WO1997US03646
Priority number, dateUS1996061210407.03.1996         Original published format: US 612104
[1998/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9733438
Date:12.09.1997
Language:EN
[1997/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0885529
Date:23.12.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.1997
[1998/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0885529
Date:07.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.09.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:H04N9/74, G06F9/38
[1998/52]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/52]
TitleGerman:LISTENGESTEUERTE VIDEOVERARBEITUNGEN[1998/52]
English:LIST CONTROLLED VIDEO OPERATIONS[1998/52]
French:OPERATIONS VIDEO COMMANDEES PAR UNE LISTE[1998/52]
Entry into regional phase30.09.1998National basic fee paid 
30.09.1998Search fee paid 
30.09.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
30.09.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.09.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
24.09.1998Request for accelerated examination filed
30.09.1998Examination requested  [1998/52]
23.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.02.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
12.06.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.11.1999Fee for grant paid
01.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0545581  (NAT SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [Y] 1,5,11,16 * page 4, line 1 - line 10 * * page 15, line 41 - line 49 * * page 20, line 15 - line 30 * * page 24, line 36 - line 47 *;
 [A]EP0306533  (FANUC LTD [JP]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0279230  (IBM [US]) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0662679  (IBM [US]) [A] 9,10,19-23 * the whole document *;
 [Y]  SANJAY DESAI, "THE ARCHITECTURE OF THE LR33020 GRAPHX PROCESSOR: A MIPS-RISC BASED X-TERMINAL CONTROLLER", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER DESIGN: VL IN COMPUTERS AND PROCESSORS, CAMBRIDGE, MA., OCT. 11 - 14, 1992, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19921011), pages 205 - 208, XP000344612 [Y] 1,5,11,16 * page 206, paragraph 3 - page 207 *
 [A]  LEGAT J -D ET AL, "A MC680x0 compatible coprocessor for binary image processing", EURO ASIC '90 (CAT. NO.90TH0316-0), PARIS, FRANCE, 29 MAY-1 JUNE 1990, ISBN 0-8186-2066-8, 1990, Los Alamitos, CA, USA, IEEE Comput. Soc, USA, pages 378 - 381, XP002081858 [A] 12 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/EASIC.1990.207972
International search[YP]US5592622  (ISFELD MARK S [US], et al);
 [YP]US5581766  (SPURLOCK RANDOLPH W [US]);
 [Y]US5448301  (MICHENER JAMES A [US]);
 [Y]US5227863  (BILBREY BRETT C [US], et al)
 [Y]  - COMPUTER GRAPHICS, March 1990, ELLSWORTH et al., "Distributing a Play List on a Multicomputer", pages 147-154.,
 [Y]  - 1994 CUSTOM INTEGRATED CIRCUIT CONFERENCE, 1 May 1994, AZIM et al., "A Low Cost Application Specific Video Codec for Consumer Video Phone", pages 6.7.1-6.7.4.,
 [Y]  - EUROPEAN DESIGN AUTOMATION CONFERENCE, 28 February 1994, FRANSSEN et al., "Control Flow Optimization for Fast System Simulation and Storage Minimization", pages 20-24.,
 [Y]  - IEE COOLQ., No. 141: APPLICATION SPECIFIC INTEGRATED CIRCUITS, 7 June 1993, DAVIDSON et al., "Generality-A Low Cost Approach to Digital Image Processing", pages 9/1-9/4.,