Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0886512

EP0886512 - GUIDANCE SYSTEM, PARTICULARLY FOR VISUALLY IMPAIRED INDIVIDUALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.09.2003
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GONZALEZ, Bernard, A.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
02 / PATTEN, Richard, L.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[1999/01]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
Application number, filing date97908982.810.03.1997
[1999/01]
WO1997US03708
Priority number, dateUS1996061078611.03.1996         Original published format: US 610786
[1999/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9733548
Date:18.09.1997
Language:EN
[1997/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0886512
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.1997
[1998/53]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0886512
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.09.1997
ClassificationInternational:A61H3/06
[1999/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/01]
TitleGerman:FÜHRUNGSSYSTEM, INSBESONDERE FÜR SEHBEHINDERTE MENSCHEN[1999/01]
English:GUIDANCE SYSTEM, PARTICULARLY FOR VISUALLY IMPAIRED INDIVIDUALS[1999/01]
French:SYSTEME DE GUIDAGE, PARTICULIEREMENT DESTINE AUX MALVOYANTS[1999/01]
Entry into regional phase11.09.1998National basic fee paid 
11.09.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
11.09.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.08.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.09.1998Examination requested  [1998/53]
16.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
15.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
31.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.08.2002Fee for grant paid
30.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR06.11.2002
IT06.11.2002
[2008/07]
Former [2006/14]FR06.11.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]DE3616186  (ROSENKE DIETMAR DIPL ING [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 41 - line 64; figure - *;
 [A]FR2024021  (BIGNON LUCIEN) [A] 1 * figures 1,7,8; claim - *;
 [A]US4715743  (SCHMANSKI DONALD W [US]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 2; figure -; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE4117872  (BIERMANN FRANK [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 44 - line 60; figures 2,4,5 *;
 [A]FR2382886  (COCHART EMMANUEL [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 12 - line 26; figure - *;
 [AD]US5227221  (HEDBLOM THOMAS P [US]) [AD] 1 * column A; figure 4B *