Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0927398

EP0927398 - OPTIMIZATION OF NODE COUPLES IN A GIVEN GRAPH SHOWING COUPLING POSSIBILITIES, WHEREBY THE GRAPH REPRESENTS A TECHNICAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/27]COMPUTER-AIDED OPTIMIZATION OF NODE COUPLES IN A GIVEN GRAPH SHOWING COUPLING POSSIBILITIES
[1999/37]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2001
Database last updated on 13.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.02.2001 [2001/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/27]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / LAUTHER, Ulrich
Käthe-Bauer-Weg 6
D-80686 München / DE
02 / MALISCH, Frank-Oliver
Mozartstrasse 32
D-85579 Neubiberg / DE
[1999/27]
Application number, filing date97909147.718.09.1997
[1999/27]
WO1997DE02108
Priority number, dateDE199613813218.09.1996         Original published format: DE 19638132
[1999/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9812652
Date:26.03.1998
Language:DE
[1998/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0927398
Date:07.07.1999
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.1998
[1999/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0927398
Date:08.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.05.1998
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/50
[1999/27]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   NL,   SE [1999/27]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ERMITTLUNG VON OPTIMIERTEN KOPPLUNGEN VON KNOTEN IN EINEM VORGEGEBENEN GRAPH MÖGLICHER KOPPLUNGEN, WOBEI DER GRAPH EIN TECHNICHES SYSTEM DARSTELLT[1999/37]
English:OPTIMIZATION OF NODE COUPLES IN A GIVEN GRAPH SHOWING COUPLING POSSIBILITIES, WHEREBY THE GRAPH REPRESENTS A TECHNICAL SYSTEM[1999/37]
French:TECHNIQUE D'OPTIMISATION DES COUPLES DE NOEUDS DANS UN GRAPHE DONNE DE COUPLAGES POSSIBLES, LE GRAPHE REPRESENTANT UN SYSTEME TECHNIQUE[1999/37]
Former [1999/27]VERFAHREN ZUR ERMITTLUNG VON OPTIMIERTEN KOPPLUNGEN VON KNOTEN IN EINEM VORGEGEBENEN GRAPH MÖGLICHER KOPPLUNGEN, DURCH EINEN RECHNER
Former [1999/27]COMPUTER-AIDED OPTIMIZATION OF NODE COUPLES IN A GIVEN GRAPH SHOWING COUPLING POSSIBILITIES
Former [1999/27]TECHNIQUE D'OPTIMISATION PAR ORDINATEUR DES COUPLES DE NOEUDS DANS UN GRAPHE DONNE DE COUPLAGES POSSIBLES
Entry into regional phase04.03.1999National basic fee paid 
04.03.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.03.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.04.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/27]
18.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.12.1999Fee for grant paid
06.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XA]  - ROSENWEIN ET AL, "a constrained steiner tree problem", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF OPERATIONAL RESEARCH, NETHERLANDS, (199503), vol. 81, no. 2, pages 430 - 439, XP002057847 [X] 1,4,7,13 * page 431, column 28 - page 432, column 11 * [A] 2,3,5,6,8

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0377-2217(93)E0245-S
 [XA]  - NOVAK R ET AL, "DISTRIBUTION OF CONSTRAINED STEINER TREE COMPUTATION IN SHORTEST-DELAY NETWORKS", MELECON '96. 8TH. MEDITERRANEAN ELECTROTECHNICAL CONFERENCE INDUSTRIAL APPLICATIONS IN POWER SYSTEMS, COMPUTER SCIENCE AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS, BARI, IT., MAY 13 - 16, 1996, DE SARIO M;MALONE B; PUGLIESE P; SAVINO M (EDS ), (19960513), VOL. 2, no. CONF. 8, pages 959 - 962, XP000699429 [X] 1,4,7,13 * page 959, column 2, line 1 - line 18 * [A] 2,3,5,6,8

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MELCON.1996.551368
 [XA]  - CONG J ET AL, "PROVABLY GOOD ALGORITHMS FOR PERFORMANCE-DRIVEN GLOBAL ROUTING", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, SAN DIEGO, MAY 10 - 13, 1992, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19920510), vol. 5 OF 6, pages 2240 - 2243, XP000338436 [X] 1,4,7,14 * page 2240, column 2, line 7 - page 2241, column 1, line 4 * [A] 2,3,5,6,8

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.1992.230514
 [A]  - DONGSHENG ET AL, "performance-driven interconnect global routing", IEEE PROCEEDINGS OF THE SIXTH GREAT LAKES SYMPOSIUM ON VLSI, US, (19960322), pages 132 - 136, XP002057848 [A] 1-9,14 * abstract *