Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0888687

EP0888687 - USER INTERFACE FOR TELEVISION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.01.2006
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.01.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.03.2006  [2006/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / CHERIAN, Lisa
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / LAMBOURNE, Robert, Andrew
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
03 / ROBERTS, Guyjames
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[1999/01]
Representative(s)Schmitz, Herman Jan Renier
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]Schmitz, Herman Jan Renier
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date97909543.710.11.1997
[1999/01]
WO1997IB01416
Priority number, dateUS1996077208020.12.1996         Original published format: US 772080
[1999/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9828912
Date:02.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0888687
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.1998
[1999/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0888687
Date:16.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE02.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/445
[1999/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1999/01]
TitleGerman:BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLE FÜR FERNSEHEN[1999/01]
English:USER INTERFACE FOR TELEVISION[1999/01]
French:INTERFACE UTILISATEUR POUR TELEVISION[1999/01]
Entry into regional phase21.09.1998National basic fee paid 
21.09.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
04.01.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.01.1999Examination requested  [1999/10]
11.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2005Fee for grant paid
17.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
02.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
01.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search   [ ] - No relevant documents have been disclosed.
Examination   - No further relevant documents have been disclosed.