Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0872847

EP0872847 - MEMORY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.06.2004  [2004/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oki Electric Industry Company, Limited
7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 105 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/43]For all designated states
Oki Electric Industry Company, Limited
7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 105 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TAKASUGI, Atushi
Oki Elec Ind. Co., Ltd., 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP
[1998/43]
Representative(s)Read, Matthew Charles , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/43]Read, Matthew Charles , et al
Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date97909696.330.10.1997
[1998/43]
WO1997JP03954
Priority number, dateJP1996028860330.10.1996         Original published format: JP 28860396
[1998/43]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9819309
Date:07.05.1998
Language:EN
[1998/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0872847
Date:21.10.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.1998
[1998/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0872847
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP07.05.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:G11C11/407, G11C7/00
[1999/02]
Former International [1998/43]G11C11/407
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1998/43]
TitleGerman:SPEICHER[1998/43]
English:MEMORY[1998/43]
French:MEMOIRE[1998/43]
Entry into regional phase26.06.1998Translation filed 
25.06.1998National basic fee paid 
25.06.1998Search fee paid 
25.06.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/43]
11.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.2003Fee for grant paid
08.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
20.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
19.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
29.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US5313431  (URUMA KOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 12, line 49 - column 13, line 41; figure 3 *;
 [X]US4947373  (YAMAGUCHI YASUNORI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 2, line 24 - line 55; figure 7 * * column 19, line 37 - column 24, line 18 *
International search[A]JPS59131979  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC);
 [A]JPS63261598  (HITACHI LTD, et al);
 [A]JPH05210971  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD)