EP0938636 - CORROSION PROTECTION FOR UTILITY BOILER SIDE WALLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2005 [2005/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cinergy Technology, Inc. 1000 E. Main Street Plainfield, IN 46168 / US | For all designated states Energy Systems Associates 564 Washington Avenue Pittsburgh, PA 15106-2848 / US | [1999/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAMER, Edward, D. 526 Hilton Court Evansville, IN 47711 / US | 02 /
URICH, Joseph, A. 2065 Menold Drive Allison Park, PA 15101 / US | 03 /
LOCHART, Keith, S. 1006 Deertrail Drive Lawrenceville, IL 62439 / US | 04 /
BREEN, Bernard, P. 630-B Trimont Lane Pittsburgh, PA 15211 / US | 05 /
GABRIELSON, James, E. 11585 Riverview Road, N.E. Hanover, MN 55341 / US | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | Allman, Peter John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | Allman, Peter John, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 97910091.4 | 14.10.1997 | [1999/35] | WO1997US18447 | Priority number, date | US19960730581 | 15.10.1996 Original published format: US 730581 | [1999/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9816779 | Date: | 23.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0938636 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.04.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F23B5/00, F23B5/02, F23B7/00, F23C5/00, F23C5/08, F23C7/00, F23C7/02, F23C7/04, F23D1/00, F23J11/00, F23J15/00 | [1999/35] | CPC: |
F23C6/045 (EP,US);
F23C10/18 (KR);
F23C10/00 (KR);
F23C7/02 (EP,US);
F23L9/02 (EP,US);
F23M5/085 (EP,US);
F23C2201/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/35] | Title | German: | KORROSIONSSCHUTZ FÜR DIE SEITENWÄNDE EINES KRAFTWERKKESSELS | [1999/35] | English: | CORROSION PROTECTION FOR UTILITY BOILER SIDE WALLS | [1999/35] | French: | PROTECTION CONTRE LA CORROSION DES PAROIS LATERALES D'UNE CHAUDIERE DE CENTRALE | [1999/35] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.1999 | Search fee paid | 06.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/35] | 24.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/16] | 19.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS5949404 ; | [Y]US3877440 (WINKIN JUSTIN P) [Y] 1-3,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3403981 (BABCOCK WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,9,10* the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840718), vol. 008, no. 154, Database accession no. (M - 310), & JP59049404 A 19840322 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) [Y] 1-3,9,10 * abstract * | International search | [A]US1729024 ; | [Y]US1739594 (JACKSON GEORGE P); | [A]US1795951 (JACQUES STANLEY A); | [A]US2573910 (HENRY KREISINGER); | [X]US3877440 (WINKIN JUSTIN P); | [A]US4021186 (TENNER ARTHUR R); | [A]SU606035 (DOVZHIK VOLF B [SU], et al); | [A]US4596198 (GRESKOVICH EUGENE J [US], et al); | [A]US5022331 (SIMONEN LIISA I [US]); | [Y]US5488916 (BOZZUTO CARL R [US]); | [AP]US5672246 (RAAK KEIJO [FI]) |