Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991363

EP0991363 - CAPACITIVE REUSABLE ELECTROSURGICAL RETURN ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.05.2006
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 25.04.2007  [2007/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MEGADYNE MEDICAL PRODUCTS, INC.
11506 S.State Street
Draper, UT 84020 / US
[2000/15]
Inventor(s)01 / FLEENOR, Richard, P.
5765 South Monaco Street
Englewood, CO 80111 / US
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Finnie, Peter John
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/01]Finnie, Peter John
Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2003/03]McDonough, Jonathan
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Tower House, Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Former [2000/15]Belcher, Simon James
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date97910092.214.10.1997
[2000/15]
WO1997US18448
Priority number, dateUS1996074146930.10.1996         Original published format: US 741469
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9818395
Date:07.05.1998
Language:EN
[1998/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991363
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.1998
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991363
Date:20.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.05.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/16
[2005/29]
Former International [2000/15]A61B17/39, A61B18/16
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:WIEDERVERWENDBARE, NEUTRALE KAPAZITÄTSELEKTRODE FÜR DIE ELEKTROCHIRURGIE[2005/06]
English:CAPACITIVE REUSABLE ELECTROSURGICAL RETURN ELECTRODE[2000/15]
French:ELECTRODE DE RETOUR CAPACITIVE, REUTILISABLE ET A VOCATION ELECTRO-CHIRURGICALE[2000/15]
Former [2000/15]WIEDERVERWENDBARE,NEUTRALE KAPAZITÄTSELEKTRODE FÜR DOE ELEKTROCHIRURGIE
Entry into regional phase12.05.1999National basic fee paid 
12.05.1999Search fee paid 
12.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
12.05.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.03.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
12.05.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
13.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
07.12.2004Date of oral proceedings
29.12.2004Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
10.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.04.2005Fee for grant paid
27.04.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.04.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/26]
Request for further processing for:16.04.2004Request for further processing filed
16.04.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.04.2004Decision despatched
07.10.2003Request for further processing filed
07.10.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.10.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
25.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.07.2005
BE20.07.2005
CH20.07.2005
FI20.07.2005
LI20.07.2005
NL20.07.2005
IE14.10.2005
DK20.10.2005
GR20.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
PT21.12.2005
[2007/17]
Former [2006/49]AT20.07.2005
BE20.07.2005
CH20.07.2005
FI20.07.2005
LI20.07.2005
NL20.07.2005
IE14.10.2005
DK20.10.2005
GR20.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
PT21.12.2005
Former [2006/30]AT20.07.2005
BE20.07.2005
CH20.07.2005
FI20.07.2005
LI20.07.2005
NL20.07.2005
DK20.10.2005
GR20.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
PT21.12.2005
Former [2006/26]AT20.07.2005
BE20.07.2005
CH20.07.2005
FI20.07.2005
LI20.07.2005
NL20.07.2005
DK20.10.2005
GR20.10.2005
PT21.12.2005
Former [2006/25]AT20.07.2005
BE20.07.2005
CH20.07.2005
FI20.07.2005
LI20.07.2005
NL20.07.2005
GR20.10.2005
PT21.12.2005
Former [2006/14]AT20.07.2005
CH20.07.2005
FI20.07.2005
LI20.07.2005
NL20.07.2005
GR20.10.2005
PT21.12.2005
Former [2006/13]AT20.07.2005
FI20.07.2005
Documents cited:Search[XA]GB2052269  (MOCHIDA PHARM CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * [A] 7-23
International search[X]US4166465  (COX JOHN A [US], et al);
 [Y]US4237886  (KAWASHIMA TADASU [JP], et al);
 [X]US4669468  (CARTMELL JAMES V [US], et al)
 [Y]  - JAMA, 16 Aug. 1971, Vol. 217, No. 7, WALD A.S. et al., "Accidental Burns Associated with Electrocautery", pages 916-921.,
ExaminationUS4088133