EP1006874 - GAME APPARATUS FOR MONITORING PSYCHO-PHYSIOLOGICAL RESPONSES TO QUESTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novid Inc. P.O. Box 23 Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6S8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states Novid Inc. P.O. Box 23 Niagara Falls, Ontario L2E 6S8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLASZYNSKI, John, E. 15 Glenbarr Road St. Catharines, Ontario L2T 1Y2 / CA | 02 /
TIBBS, Daniel, G. 4883 Simcoe Street Niagara Falls, Ontario L2E 1V8 / CA | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 97910174.8 | 28.10.1997 | [2000/24] | WO1997CA00791 | Priority number, date | US19960741420 | 29.10.1996 Original published format: US 741420 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9818385 | Date: | 07.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1006874 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1006874 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/05, A63F9/18 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
A63F9/183 (EP,US);
A61B5/0533 (EP,US);
A63F2250/265 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/24] | Title | German: | SPIELGERÄT ZUR BEOBACHTUNG VON DURCHFRAGEN HERVORGERUFENEN PSYCHO-PHYSIOLOGISCHEN REAKTIONEN | [2000/24] | English: | GAME APPARATUS FOR MONITORING PSYCHO-PHYSIOLOGICAL RESPONSES TO QUESTIONS | [2000/24] | French: | APPAREIL DE JEU CONTROLANT LES REPONSES PSYCHOPHYSIOLOGIQUES A DES QUESTIONS | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.05.1999 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 08.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US4625732 (KASA ZOLTAN [HU], et al) [X] 1,5 * column 4, line 39 - line 56 * * column 5, line 46 - column 6, line 18 * [A] 14 [Y] 7; | [YA]US5209494 (SPECTOR DONALD [US]) [Y] 7 * column 3, line 44 - line 68 * * column 4, line 19 - column 5, line 68 * [A] 1,9; | [A]US4812126 (GILLIKSEN BYRON [US]) [A] 1,2,7,8,12,14 * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 45 *; | [A]WO9302622 (SOFTWARE SOLUTIONS LTD [GB]) [A] 1,6-9,14 * page 4, line 5 - page 6, line 34 * * page 12, line 11 - page 13, line 26 *; | [A]US5089745 (IANNINI ROBERT E [US]) [A] 1,7 * column 4, line 10 - line 68 * | by applicant | US3648686 | US3841316 | US4331160 |