Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0963454

EP0963454 - METHOD OF MAKING CEMENTED CARBIDE BY POWDER INJECTION MOLDING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.10.2003
Database last updated on 18.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sandvik Aktiebolag (publ)
811 81 Sandviken / SE
[1999/50]
Inventor(s)01 / HURME, Ingrid c/o Eriksson
Stenbrottsgatan 4
S-172 33 Sundyberg / SE
02 / SAMUELSON, Peter
Pokalvägen 6
S-117 40 Stockholm / SE
[1999/50]
Representative(s)Taquist, Henrik Lennart Emanuel , et al
Sandvik AB
Patent Department
811 81 Sandviken / SE
[N/P]
Former [1999/50]Taquist, Lennart , et al
Sandvik AB Patent Department
811 81 SANDVIKEN / SE
Application number, filing date97910662.214.10.1997
[1999/50]
WO1997SE01715
Priority number, dateSE1996000393625.10.1996         Original published format: SE 9603936
[1999/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9818973
Date:07.05.1998
Language:EN
[1998/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0963454
Date:15.12.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.1998
[1999/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0963454
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE07.05.1998
ClassificationInternational:C22C29/00, C22C1/05
[1999/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1999/50]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON ZEMENTIERTEM CARBID DURCH SPRITZGIESSEN VON PULVER[1999/50]
English:METHOD OF MAKING CEMENTED CARBIDE BY POWDER INJECTION MOLDING[1999/50]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CARBURE FRITTE PAR MOULAGE PAR INJECTION DE POUDRES[1999/50]
Entry into regional phase11.02.1999National basic fee paid 
11.02.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.02.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.04.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
15.02.1999Examination requested  [1999/50]
22.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.07.2002Fee for grant paid
31.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR11.12.2002
IT11.12.2002
[2008/07]
Former [2006/14]FR11.12.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]US4478888  (BENJAMIN MARY L [US], et al);
 [A]US4397889  (BENJAMIN MARY LOU, et al);
 [A]EP0443048  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP])