Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975208

EP0975208 - CARRIER FOR SEEDS AND CONSUMABLE PARTICULATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.02.2004
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MJM Technologies, L.L.P.
5810 Stacy Trail
Stacy, MN 55079 / US
[2003/22]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
MJM Technologies
5810 Stacy Trail, P.O. Box 177
Stacy, MN 55079-0177 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KAZEMZADEH, Massoud
10025 Beard Avenue South
Bloomington, MN 55431 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Stuttard, Garry Philip
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Arena Point
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Stuttard, Garry Philip
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date97910824.807.10.1997
[2000/05]
WO1997US18069
Priority number, dateUS19960028021P09.10.1996         Original published format: US 28021 P
US1997081850014.03.1997         Original published format: US 818500
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9815166
Date:16.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975208
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.1998
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0975208
Date:09.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US16.04.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:A01C1/04
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:TRÄGER FÜR SAMEN UND KONSUMIERBARE PARTIKELN[2000/05]
English:CARRIER FOR SEEDS AND CONSUMABLE PARTICULATES[2000/05]
French:SUPPORT DE SEMENCES ET DE PARTICULES CONSOMMABLES[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase21.04.1999National basic fee paid 
21.04.1999Search fee paid 
21.04.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.04.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.05.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.04.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
29.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.09.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
16.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2002Fee for grant paid
19.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14]
Request for further processing for:03.10.2002Request for further processing filed
03.10.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.10.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
03.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.199903   M06   Fee paid on   14.01.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR09.04.2003
AT07.10.2003
FI07.10.2003
GB07.10.2003
IE07.10.2003
LU07.10.2003
PT07.10.2003
ES08.10.2003
SE08.10.2003
BE31.10.2003
CH31.10.2003
DK31.10.2003
LI31.10.2003
MC31.10.2003
[2008/29]
Former [2008/23]GR09.04.2003
AT07.10.2003
FI07.10.2003
GB07.10.2003
IE07.10.2003
LU07.10.2003
ES08.10.2003
SE08.10.2003
BE31.10.2003
CH31.10.2003
DK31.10.2003
LI31.10.2003
MC31.10.2003
Former [2005/27]AT07.10.2003
FI07.10.2003
GB07.10.2003
IE07.10.2003
LU07.10.2003
ES08.10.2003
SE08.10.2003
BE31.10.2003
CH31.10.2003
DK31.10.2003
LI31.10.2003
MC31.10.2003
Former [2005/13]AT07.10.2003
FI07.10.2003
GB07.10.2003
IE07.10.2003
LU07.10.2003
SE08.10.2003
BE31.10.2003
CH31.10.2003
DK31.10.2003
LI31.10.2003
MC31.10.2003
Former [2005/03]FI07.10.2003
GB07.10.2003
IE07.10.2003
LU07.10.2003
SE08.10.2003
BE31.10.2003
CH31.10.2003
DK31.10.2003
LI31.10.2003
MC31.10.2003
Former [2005/02]FI07.10.2003
GB07.10.2003
LU07.10.2003
SE08.10.2003
BE31.10.2003
CH31.10.2003
DK31.10.2003
LI31.10.2003
MC31.10.2003
Former [2005/01]FI07.10.2003
GB07.10.2003
LU07.10.2003
SE08.10.2003
BE31.10.2003
CH31.10.2003
LI31.10.2003
Former [2004/45]FI07.10.2003
GB07.10.2003
LU07.10.2003
SE08.10.2003
CH31.10.2003
LI31.10.2003
Former [2004/44]FI07.10.2003
LU07.10.2003
SE08.10.2003
CH31.10.2003
LI31.10.2003
Former [2004/40]FI07.10.2003
LU07.10.2003
SE08.10.2003
Former [2004/39]LU07.10.2003
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9613560  (STEVENS IAN LAWRENCE [AU]) [X] 1,7,8,10,17,19,22 * page 2, line 14 - line 21 * * page 5, line 19 - line 31 * * page 5, line 37 - page 6, line 22; figures 3,4; claims 1,3,13,16,21,24-29 * [Y] 2,3,5,20;
 [Y]US5274951  (BESING DAVID J [US]) [Y] 2,20 * column 2, line 9 - line 23 * * column 3, line 6 - line 15 *;
 [Y]FR2701347  (COSMOGRAFICA SNC FEDRICI LUIGI [IT]) [Y] 3,5 * page 2, line 11 - line 20; figure 1 *;
 [A]US3999358  (LEWIS PAUL A) [A] 1 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 27 *
International search[A]US5274951  (BESING DAVID J [US])