Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1018022

EP1018022 - ENERGY METER WITH POWER QUALITY MONITORING AND DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  14.12.2012
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2012Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 16.01.2013  [2013/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Elster Solutions, LLC
208 South Rogers Lane
Raleigh, NC 27610 / US
[2010/17]
Former [2010/10]For all designated states
Elster Solutions, LLC
C/o American Meter Company 300 Welsh Road Building One
Horsham, PA 19044 / US
Former [2004/38]For all designated states
Elster Electricity, LLC
c/o American Meter Company, 300 Welsh Road, Building One
Horsham, PA 19044 / US
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
ABB Inc.
1021 Main Campus Drive
Raleigh, NC 27606 / US
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
ABB POWER T & D COMPANY INC.
Centennial Campus - NCSU, 1021 Main Campus Drive
Raleigh, NC 27606 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HUBBARD, Vick, A.
2400 Mica Mine Lane
Wake Forest, NC 27587 / US
02 / MUNDAY, Mark, L.
8120 Old Deer Trail Road
Raleigh, NC 27615 / US
03 / HEMMINGER, Rodney, C.
6300 Lakeland Drive
Raleigh, NC 27612 / US
04 / HOLDSCLAW, Scott, T.
4916 Will-O-Dean Road
Raleigh, NC 27616 / US
[2000/28]
Representative(s)Gill, David Alan
WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/49]Gill, David Alan
W.P. Thompson & Co., 55 Drury Lane
London WC2B 5SQ / GB
Former [2000/28]W.P. THOMPSON & CO.
Eastcheap House Central Approach
Letchworth, Hertfordshire SG6 3DS / GB
Application number, filing date97910922.016.10.1997
[2000/28]
WO1997US18457
Priority number, dateUS19960028986P22.10.1996         Original published format: US 28986 P
[2000/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9818013
Date:30.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/17]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1018022
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1998
[2000/28]
Search report(s)International search reportUS23.07.1998
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP20.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01R1/00, G01R21/133
[2000/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/28]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRIZITÄTSZÄHLER MIT STROMQUALITÄTSÜBERWACHUNG UND MIT DIAGNOSESYSTEM[2000/28]
English:ENERGY METER WITH POWER QUALITY MONITORING AND DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEMS[2000/28]
French:DISPOSITIF DE MESURE D'ENERGIE COMPORTANT DES SYSTEMES DE DIAGNOSTIC ET DE CONTROLE DE QUALITE D'ENERGIE[2000/28]
Entry into regional phase25.03.1999National basic fee paid 
25.03.1999Search fee paid 
25.03.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.03.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.04.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
25.03.1999Examination requested  [2000/28]
04.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.01.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
18.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2008Date of oral proceedings
05.06.2008Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
05.06.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
05.12.2012Application withdrawn by applicant  [2013/03]
Appeal following examination05.08.2008Appeal received No.  T2088/08
10.10.2008Statement of grounds filed
30.08.2012Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn
Divisional application(s)EP08166392.4  / EP2088437
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.06.2004
Request for further processing for:18.03.2005Request for further processing filed
18.03.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.05.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
15.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
20.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
26.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
07.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
25.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
13.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
16.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
14.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
27.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 13
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 14
20.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 15
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201216   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5469049  (BRIESE FORREST W [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,15,16,22 * column 4, line 38 - column 6, line 35; figures 3,4 * * column 7, line 54 - line 59; figure 7 * * column 12, line 25 - line 43 * * column 17, line 35 - column 18, line 47 * * column 19, line 17 - line 32 *;
 [X]US4672555  (HART GEORGE W [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 18 * * column 10, line 56 - column 11, line 31; figures 3A,3B * * column 13, line 38 - column 14, line 64 * * column 15, line 41 - line 46 *;
 [X]US5525898  (LEE JR ROBERT E [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 3, line 38 - column 6, line L; figures 2,3 *
International search[A]US5315235  (ATHERTON KENNETH W [US], et al);
 [X]US5469049  (BRIESE FORREST W [US], et al);
 [A]US5555508  (MUNDAY MARK L [US], et al)