EP0930962 - BREATHABLE ELASTIC POLYMERIC FILM COMPOSITES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/30] | BREATHABLE ELASTIC POLYMERIC FILM LAMINATES | ||
[2002/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tredegar Film Products Corporation 1100 Boulders Parkway Richmond, VA 23225 / US | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states Tredegar Film Products Corporation 1100 Boulders Parkway Richmond, VA 23225 / US | ||
For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | |||
Former [2001/27] | For all designated states Tredegar Film Products Corporation 1100 Boulders Parkway Richmond, VA 23225 / US | ||
Former [1999/48] | For all designated states Tredegar Corporation 1100 Boulders Parkway Richmond, VA 23225 / US | ||
Former [1999/30] | For all designated states TREDEGAR INDUSTRIES, INC. 1100 Boulders Parkway Richmond, Virginia 23225 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PELKIE, James, E. 121 Country Club Road Terre Haute, IN 47803 / US | 02 /
Curro, John Joseph 11604 Stablewatch Court Cincinnati, Ohio 45249 / US | 03 /
Mansfield, Michele Ann 580 Wirham Place Cincinnati, Ohio 45220 / US | 04 /
Dobrin, George Christopher 4407 Hyacinth Drive Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | [2004/01] |
Former [1999/30] | 01 /
PELKIE, James, E. 121 Country Club Road Terre Haute, IN 47803 / US | Representative(s) | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [1999/48] | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97910949.3 | 09.10.1997 | [1999/30] | WO1997US18537 | Priority number, date | US19960729629 | 10.10.1996 Original published format: US 729629 | US19960728692 | 10.10.1996 Original published format: US 728692 | [1999/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9815399 | Date: | 16.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0930962 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0930962 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.04.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/04, B32B3/10, D03D17/00 | [1999/30] | CPC: |
A61F13/512 (EP);
B29C48/16 (KR);
A61F13/15731 (EP);
A61F13/51121 (EP);
B26F1/26 (EP);
B32B27/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/30] | Title | German: | ATEMFÄHIGE ELASTISCHE POLYMERFOLIENVERBUNDSTOFFE | [2002/48] | English: | BREATHABLE ELASTIC POLYMERIC FILM COMPOSITES | [2002/48] | French: | COMPOSITE POLYMERE ELASTIQUE IMPER-RESPIRANT | [2002/48] |
Former [1999/30] | ATEMFÄHIGE ELASTISCHE POLYMERFOLIENLAMMINATE | ||
Former [1999/30] | BREATHABLE ELASTIC POLYMERIC FILM LAMINATES | ||
Former [1999/30] | LAMINE POLYMERE ELASTIQUE IMPER-RESPIRANT | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.1999 | Search fee paid | 07.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/30] | 22.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24] | Request for further processing for: | 27.03.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 27.03.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.05.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5332613 (TAYLOR JACK D [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * figure 4 *; | [Y]WO9424354 (GUIAL SA [FR], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 12, line 23 - line 24; figures 2D,,4 *; | [A]WO9604131 (TREDEGAR IND INC [US]) [A] 1 * figure 2; claims 1,8 *; | [A]US5514470 (HAFFNER WILLIAM B [US], et al) [A] 1* figure 9; example 8 *; | [Y]WO9621760 (JAPAN ABSORBENT TECH INST [JP], et al) [Y] 1-11 * example 3 * | International search | [Y]US4995930 (MERZ WINFRIED [DE], et al); | [Y]US5336554 (KNIGHT DAVID [US]); | [Y]US5422172 (WU PAI-CHUAN [US]); | [Y]US5462541 (BRUEMMER MARY A [US], et al) |