blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0932979


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
20.02.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.03.2009  [2009/13]
17.10.2008 No opposition filed within time limit published on  19.11.2008  [2008/47]
10.10.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.11.2008  [2008/46]
12.09.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.10.2008  [2008/42]
29.08.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.10.2008  [2008/40]
13.06.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.07.2008  [2008/29]
30.05.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.07.2008  [2008/27]
16.05.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.06.2008  [2008/25]
09.05.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.06.2008  [2008/24]
02.05.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.06.2008  [2008/23]
09.11.2007 (Expected) grant published on  12.12.2007  [2007/50]
08.11.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.09.2007 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
21.09.2007 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
24.08.2007 Change - divisional application(s) published on  26.09.2007  [2007/39]
10.05.2007 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.03.2007 Deletion: Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.02.2007 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
07.11.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.05.2006 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
31.05.2006 New entry: Reply to examination report
30.05.2006 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
17.05.2006 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
09.03.2006 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
25.11.2005 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.10.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.07.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.10.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.11.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.10.2002 Renewal fee
18.10.2001 Renewal fee
23.10.2000 Renewal fee
03.03.2000 Supplementary search report published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
03.03.2000 Change - classification published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
22.10.1999 Renewal fee
18.06.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  04.08.1999 [1999/31]
18.06.1999 Request for examination filed published on  04.08.1999 [1999/31]
05.05.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
28.04.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
26.04.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
10.07.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
29.06.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
01.12.1997 PCT data prior to European publication