Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0932979

EP0932979 - ACCESS TO INTERNET DATA THROUGH A TELEVISION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.10.2008
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 25.03.2009  [2009/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gemstar Development Corporation
135 Los Robles Avenue, Suite 870
Pasadena, California 91101 / US
[2007/50]
Former [1999/31]For all designated states
Gemstar Development Corporation
135 Los Robles Avenue, Suite 870
Pasadena, California 91101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MACRAE, Douglas, B.
23 Cart Path Road
Weston, MA 02193 / US
02 / YUEN, Henry, C.
P.O. Box 1159
Redondo Beach, CA 90278 / US
03 / MANKOVITZ, Roy, J.
18057 Medley Drive
Encino, CA 91316 / US
04 / LEUNG, Elsie, Y.
1302 Via Del Rey
South Pasadena, CA 91030 / US
05 / KWOH, Daniel, S.
3975 Hampstead Road
La Canada/Flintridge, CA 91011 / US
06 / WESTBERG, Thomas, E.
4 Puffer Road
Sudbury, MA 01776 / US
[1999/31]
Representative(s)Kinsler, Maureen Catherine , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London
WC1R 4PJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/31]Kinsler, Maureen Catherine , et al
Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date97910985.716.10.1997
[1999/31]
WO1997US18664
Priority number, dateUS19960028138P16.10.1996         Original published format: US 28138 P
US19960032571P04.12.1996         Original published format: US 32571 P
US19960032136P09.12.1996         Original published format: US 32136 P
US19970035236P01.01.1997         Original published format: US 35236 P
US19970035029P08.01.1997         Original published format: US 35029 P
US19970040763P14.03.1997         Original published format: US 40763 P
[1999/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9817064
Date:23.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0932979
Date:04.08.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.1998
[1999/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0932979
Date:12.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.04.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/173, H04N7/088, H04N5/445
[2000/16]
Former International [1999/31]H04N7/173, H04N7/16, H04N7/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/31]
TitleGerman:INTERNETDATENZUGRIFF ÜBER FERNSEHSYSTEM[1999/31]
English:ACCESS TO INTERNET DATA THROUGH A TELEVISION SYSTEM[1999/31]
French:ACCES A DES DONNEES INTERNET PAR LE BIAIS D'UN SYSTEME DE TELEVISION[1999/31]
Entry into regional phase26.04.1999National basic fee paid 
26.04.1999Search fee paid 
26.04.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
26.04.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.05.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
26.04.1999Examination requested  [1999/31]
27.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.03.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
15.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2007Fee for grant paid
11.09.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP07075668.9  / EP1850594
EP10006661.2  / EP2259593
EP10178981.6  / EP2293563
Opposition(s)15.09.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/47]
Request for further processing for:15.05.2006Request for further processing filed
17.05.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.06.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
28.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
27.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
29.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.12.2007
BE12.12.2007
CH12.12.2007
DK12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
LI12.12.2007
NL12.12.2007
SE12.03.2008
GR13.03.2008
PT12.05.2008
[2009/13]
Former [2008/46]AT12.12.2007
BE12.12.2007
CH12.12.2007
DK12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
LI12.12.2007
NL12.12.2007
SE12.03.2008
PT12.05.2008
Former [2008/42]AT12.12.2007
BE12.12.2007
CH12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
LI12.12.2007
NL12.12.2007
SE12.03.2008
PT12.05.2008
Former [2008/40]AT12.12.2007
BE12.12.2007
CH12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
LI12.12.2007
NL12.12.2007
SE12.03.2008
Former [2008/29]AT12.12.2007
CH12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
LI12.12.2007
NL12.12.2007
SE12.03.2008
Former [2008/27]CH12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
LI12.12.2007
NL12.12.2007
SE12.03.2008
Former [2008/24]CH12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
LI12.12.2007
SE12.03.2008
Former [2008/23]CH12.12.2007
LI12.12.2007
SE12.03.2008
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE19502922  (FRIDLEY TECHN LTD [VG]) [Y] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4431438  (NOKIA DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 35 * * column 5, lines 5-9 * * column 8, lines 22-25 *
 [Y]  "VERKNUEPFUNG VON TV MIT INTERNET", FUNKSCHAU,DE,FRANZIS-VERLAG K.G. MUNCHEN, (19960816), vol. 68, no. 18, ISSN 0016-2841, pages 70 - 71, XP000631189 [Y] 1-20 * the whole document *
 [Y]  BACH U ET AL, "MULTIMEDIA-TERMINAL ALS ENDGERAET", FUNKSCHAU,DE,FRANZIS-VERLAG K.G. MUNCHEN, (19960301), vol. 68, no. 6, ISSN 0016-2841, pages 70 - 75, XP000556486 [Y] 1-20 * the whole document *
 [Y]  HIRTZ G ET AL, "OPEN TV: BETRIEBSSYSTEM FUER INTERAKTIVES FERNSEHEN", FERNSEH UND KINOTECHNIK,DE,VDE VERLAG GMBH. BERLIN, (19960301), vol. 50, no. 3, ISSN 0015-0142, pages 84 - 89, XP000581417 [Y] 3,4,10-13 * paragraph [03.3] *
 [A]  BACH U ET AL, "MULTIMEDIALES TV-GEREAT", RADIO FERNSEHEN ELEKTRONIK,DE,VEB VERLAG TECHNIK. BERLIN, (19960801), vol. 45, no. 9, ISSN 1436-1574, pages 28,30 - 31, XP000636538 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
International search[XP]WO9722207
 [XP]WO9712486
 [XP]WO9733434
 [YP]WO9713368