Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0932389

EP0932389 - OPHTHALMIC COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING A CARBONIC ANHYDRASE INHIBITOR AND XANTHAN GUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 25.04.2007  [2007/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LABORATOIRES MERCK SHARP & DOHME-CHIBRET SNC
3, Avenue Hoche
75008 Paris / FR
[1999/31]
Inventor(s)01 / CHASTAING, Gilles
Laboratoires MSD-Chibret, Route de Marsat
F-63200 Riom / FR
02 / PLAZONNET, Bernard
Laboratoires MSD-Chibret, Route de Marsat
F-63200 Riom / FR
03 / ROZIER, Annouk
Laboratoires MSD-Chibret, Route de Marsat
F-63200 Riom / FR
[1999/31]
Representative(s)Hiscock, Ian James , et al
European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road
Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/31]Hiscock, Ian James , et al
European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road
Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB
Application number, filing date97911223.209.10.1997
[1999/31]
WO1997EP05678
Priority number, dateFR1996001265817.10.1996         Original published format: FR 9612658
[1999/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9817249
Date:30.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0932389
Date:04.08.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1998
[1999/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0932389
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.04.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/00
[1999/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/31]
TitleGerman:EINEN CARBOANHYDRASE-HEMMER UND XANTHANGUMMI ENTHALTENDES AUGENARZNEIMITTEL[1999/31]
English:OPHTHALMIC COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING A CARBONIC ANHYDRASE INHIBITOR AND XANTHAN GUM[1999/31]
French:COMPOSITIONS OPHTALMIQUES CONTENANT UN INHIBITEUR D'ANHYDRASE CARBONIQUE ET DE LA GOMME DE XANTHANE[1999/31]
Entry into regional phase17.05.1999National basic fee paid 
17.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.05.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.04.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.05.1999Examination requested  [1999/31]
26.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.06.2002Fee for grant paid
28.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.09.2002
BE04.09.2002
CH04.09.2002
FI04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
LI04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
IE09.10.2002
LU09.10.2002
DK04.12.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
[2007/17]
Former [2005/21]AT04.09.2002
BE04.09.2002
CH04.09.2002
FI04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
LI04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
IE09.10.2002
LU09.10.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
Former [2004/39]AT04.09.2002
BE04.09.2002
CH04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
LI04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
IE09.10.2002
LU09.10.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
Former [2004/01]AT04.09.2002
BE04.09.2002
CH04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
LI04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
IE09.10.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
Former [2003/48]AT04.09.2002
BE04.09.2002
CH04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
LI04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
Former [2003/31]AT04.09.2002
CH04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
LI04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
Former [2003/22]GR04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
Former [2003/20]GR04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
Former [2003/14]SE04.12.2002
Cited inInternational search[X]US5318780  (VIEGAS TACEY X [US], et al) [X] 1,7,9,11-14 * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 4 * * column 5, line 14 - line 20 * * column 6, line 35 - line 51 * * column 7, line 50 - line 55 * * column 10, line 25 - line 36 *;
 [X]EP0507224  (ALCON LAB INC [US]) [X] 1,7-9,11-14 * claims 1,3,4,11-13 * * page 14; example 19 *;
 [A]WO9427578  (PHARMACIA AB [SE], et al) [A] 10 * claims 1-4 * * page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 4, paragraph 5 *