blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0936890 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0936890



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 174
11.09.2006 Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore Search / examination 1
21.10.2004 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
06.11.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.05.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
27.05.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
27.05.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
25.03.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
25.03.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
25.03.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
03.03.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
03.03.2003 Claims Search / examination 1
03.03.2003 Description Search / examination 7
03.03.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.02.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 12
02.12.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
02.12.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.11.2002 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
16.11.2002 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
16.08.2002 General enquiry Search / examination 1
12.08.2002 General enquiry Search / examination 1
18.08.2001 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
18.08.2001 Claims Search / examination 5
07.03.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
16.02.2000 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
27.12.1999 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
10.12.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.12.1999 Partial European search report Search / examination 3
15.04.1999 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
15.04.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
02.10.1998 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 1
10.07.1998 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
30.04.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
30.04.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 26
30.04.1998 Priority document Search / examination 30
17.03.1998 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 7
17.03.1998 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 5
17.03.1998 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 6