blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0936890


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.01.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.02.2008  [2008/07]
26.11.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.01.2005  [2005/02]
05.11.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.12.2004  [2004/52]
22.10.2004 No opposition filed within time limit published on  08.12.2004  [2004/50]
24.09.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.11.2004  [2004/46]
25.06.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.08.2004  [2004/33]
11.06.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.07.2004  [2004/31]
07.05.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.06.2004  [2004/26]
23.04.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.06.2004  [2004/24]
31.10.2003 (Expected) grant published on  17.12.2003  [2003/51]
30.10.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.06.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.03.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.03.2003 Change - German title published on  07.05.2003  [2003/19]
07.03.2003 Examination report or reply
21.02.2003 Change - divisional application(s) published on  09.04.2003  [2003/15]
29.11.2002 First examination report
27.11.2002 Examination report or reply
22.11.2002 Change - representative published on  08.01.2003  [2003/02]
23.10.2002 Renewal fee
18.10.2001 Renewal fee
24.08.2001 Amendment by applicant
23.10.2000 Renewal fee
11.12.1999 Supplementary search report published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]
03.12.1999 Change - classification published on  19.01.2000 [2000/03]
22.10.1999 Renewal fee
23.07.1999 Change - representative published on  08.09.1999 [1999/36]
09.07.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.08.1999 [1999/34]
09.07.1999 Request for examination filed published on  25.08.1999 [1999/34]
22.05.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
17.05.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
17.05.1999 Change - extension states
26.04.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
17.07.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
29.06.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
09.12.1997 PCT data prior to European publication