Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0936890

EP0936890 - METHODS FOR TREATING URINARY INCONTINENCE IN MAMMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.10.2004
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MICRO THERAPEUTICS, INC.
1062-F Calle Negocio
San Clemente, CA 92673 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/34]For all designated states
Micro Therapeutics, Inc.
1062-F Calle Negocio
San Clemente, CA 92673 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WALLACE, George
10 Brentano Road
Coto De Caza, CA 92679 / US
02 / GREFF, Richard, J.
2891 Alton Drive
St. Pete Beach, FL 33706 / US
[1999/34]
Representative(s)Audier, Philippe André , et al
BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/02]Audier, Philippe André , et al
Brevalex, 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Former [1999/34]Des Termes, Monique , et al
c/o Société de Protection des Inventions 25, rue de Ponthieu
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date97911674.610.10.1997
[1999/34]
WO1997US18313
Priority number, dateUS1996073401618.10.1996         Original published format: US 734016
[1999/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9817201
Date:30.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0936890
Date:25.08.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1998
[1999/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0936890
Date:17.12.2003
Language:EN
[2003/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.04.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/02, A61L27/00, A61L31/00
[2000/03]
Former International [1999/34]A61F2/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/34]
Extension statesAL16.04.1999
LT16.04.1999
LV16.04.1999
RO16.04.1999
SI16.04.1999
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HARNINKONTINENZ VON SÄUGETIEREN[2003/19]
English:METHODS FOR TREATING URINARY INCONTINENCE IN MAMMALS[1999/34]
French:PROCEDES SERVANT A TRAITER L'INCONTINENCE URINAIRE CHEZ LES MAMMIFERES[1999/34]
Former [1999/34]VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HARNINKONTINENZ IN SAUGETIEREN
Entry into regional phase16.04.1999National basic fee paid 
16.04.1999Search fee paid 
16.04.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
16.04.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.05.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
16.04.1999Examination requested  [1999/34]
18.08.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.05.2003Fee for grant paid
27.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP03075401.4  / EP1312382
EP05102557.5  / EP1547627
Opposition(s)20.09.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
20.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.12.2003
BE17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
NL17.12.2003
DK17.03.2004
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
ES28.03.2004
PT17.05.2004
[2008/07]
Former [2005/02]AT17.12.2003
BE17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
NL17.12.2003
DK17.03.2004
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
ES28.03.2004
Former [2004/52]AT17.12.2003
BE17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
NL17.12.2003
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
ES28.03.2004
Former [2004/46]AT17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
NL17.12.2003
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
ES28.03.2004
Former [2004/33]AT17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
NL17.12.2003
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
Former [2004/31]AT17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
SE17.03.2004
Former [2004/26]FI17.12.2003
SE17.03.2004
Former [2004/24]SE17.03.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]WO8500969  (SKY POLYMERS [US]) [X] 1-7 * examples 1-4; claim - *;
 [X]JPH06107549  ;
 [PX]WO9727888  (MICRO THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [PX]WO9704657  (MICRO THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9319702  (UROPLASTY INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * claim - *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 20, Database accession no. 1994-163847, XP002123426 & JPH06107549 A 19940419 (NIPPON KANKOH SHIKISO KENKYUSHO KK) [X] 1-7 * abstract *
International search[X]US5007940  (BERG ERIC P [US]);
 [YP]US5580568  (GREFF RICHARD J [US], et al)
 [Y]  - JOURNAL NEUROSURGERY, Volume 77, October 1992, KINUGASA K., "Direct Thrombosis of Aneurysms with Cellulose Acetate Polymer", pages 501-507.,