blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0934249

EP0934249 - CONFORMATIONALLY RESTRICTED POLYAMINES AND THEIR USE AS ANTINEOPLASTIC AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.01.2003
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip31.01.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.03.2003  [2003/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WISCONSIN ALUMNI RESEARCH FOUNDATION
614 Walnut Street, 13th Floor
Madison, Wisconsin 53707-7365 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/32]For all designated states
WISCONSIN ALUMNI RESEARCH FOUNDATION
614 Walnut Street, Floor 13
Madison, Wisconsin 53707-7365 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FRYDMAN, Benjamin, J.
821 Holt Circle
Madison, WI 53719 / US
02 / MARTON, Laurence, J.
5810 Tree Line Drive
Fitchburg, WI 53711 / US
03 / REDDY, Vendohar, K.
410 Augusta Drive
Madison, WI 53717 / US
04 / VALASINAS, Aldonia, L.
821 Holt Circle
Madison, WI 53719 / US
05 / WITIAK, Donald, T.
3046 Bosshard Drive
Madison, WI 53711 / US
[1999/39]
Former [1999/32]01 / FRYDMAN, Benjamin, J.
402 N. Eau Claire Avenue
Madison, WI 53705 / US
02 / MARTON, Laurence, J.
5810 Tree Line Drive
Fitchburg, WI 53711 / US
03 / REDDY, Vendohar, K.
Apartment 30B,University Houses
Madison, WI 53705 / US
04 / VALASINAS, Aldonia, L.
402 N. Eau Claire Avenue
Madison, WI 53705 / US
05 / WITIAK, Donald, T.
3046 Bosshard Drive
Madison, WI 53711 / US
Representative(s)Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine, et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/32]Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine, et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date97911695.115.10.1997
[1999/32]
WO1997US18453
Priority number, dateUS19960028680P18.10.1996         Original published format: US 28680 P
[1999/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9817624
Date:30.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0934249
Date:11.08.1999
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0934249
Date:27.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.04.1998
ClassificationIPC:C07C211/18, C07C211/22, C07C211/36
[1999/32]
CPC:
C07C211/36 (EP); A61P35/00 (EP); C07C211/18 (EP);
C07C211/22 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1999/32]
TitleGerman:IN IHRER KONFORMATION EINGESCHRÄNKTE POLYAMINE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS ANTINEOPLASTISCHE MITTEL[2001/20]
English:CONFORMATIONALLY RESTRICTED POLYAMINES AND THEIR USE AS ANTINEOPLASTIC AGENTS[1999/32]
French:POLYAMINES DE CONFORMATION RESTREINTE ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QU'AGENTS ANTINEOPLASIQUES[1999/32]
Former [1999/32]KONFORMATIONALBESCHRÄNKTE POLYAMINE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS ANTINEOPLASTISCHE MITTEL
Entry into regional phase09.04.1999National basic fee paid 
09.04.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
09.04.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.05.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.04.1999Examination requested  [1999/32]
25.11.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.03.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.11.2001Fee for grant paid
30.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9518091  (CIBA-GEIGY) [X] 1,5-9 * claims 1,12,26 *;
 [A]EP0270349  (UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA) [A] 1,9 * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0349224  (UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA) [A] 1,9 * claims 1,7 *
 [X]  - S. NAGARAJAN ET AL, "Chemistry of naturally occuring polyamines. 11. Unsaturated spermidine and spermine derivatives", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, EASTON US, (1987), vol. 52, no. 22, pages 5044 - 5046, XP002053004 [X] 1,9 * page 5044; example 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00231a044
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.