EP0939944 - COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.2001 [2001/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNIGHT, Richard Robert Bramcote, The Street Ashfield, Stowmarket, Suffolk IP14 6LY / GB | 02 /
PARKINSON, David William 36 Henley Road Ipswich, Suffolk IP1 3SA / GB | 03 /
TUCK, Robert Ernest 14 The Greenway Daventry, Northants NN11 4EE / GB | [1999/36] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Simon Benjamin, et al BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department, PP C5A BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | Robinson, Simon Benjamin, et al BT Group Legal Services, Intellectual Property Department 8th Floor, Holborn Centre 120 Holborn London EC1N 2TE / GB | ||
Former [1999/36] | Wells, David, et al BT Group Legal Services Intellectual Property Department, 8th Floor, Holborn Centre 120 Holborn London EC1N 2TE / GB | Application number, filing date | 97912391.6 | 19.11.1997 | [1999/36] | WO1997GB03180 | Priority number, date | EP19960308546 | 19.11.1996 Original published format: EP 96308546 | [1999/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9824078 | Date: | 04.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0939944 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0939944 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G08B25/01 | [1999/36] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0435 (EP,US);
G08B26/00 (EP,US);
H04M11/04 (EP,US);
H04W12/037 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1301 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13036 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13092 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13098 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13176 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13196 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13204 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13209 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13216 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13296 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1337 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1999/36] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [1999/36] | English: | COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM | [1999/36] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION | [1999/36] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/36] | 07.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US4466001 (MOORE MORRIS A [US], et al) [Y] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 26 - line 51 * *Idem* [A] 4,10; | [Y]JPH0322697 ; | [A]WO8101933 (RACAL MILGO INC [US]) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * page 17, line 28 - line 33 * * page 18, line 6 - line 10 *; | [A]US3713142 (GETCHELL E) [A] 6 * abstract * * column 5, line 19 - line 37 *; | [A]DE2815183 (STADELMAYR HANS G) [A] 7 * figure 1; claim 1 * * page 20, line 11 - line 15 *; | [A]JPH04185042 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910412), vol. 15, no. 147, Database accession no. (E - 1055), & JP03022697 A 19910131 (NEC CORP.) [Y] 1 * abstract * | [A] - SUBBARAO ET AL., "Development of a security network (SECNET) based on ISDN.", ANNUAL REVIEW OF COMMUNICATIONS, CHICAGO,IL.,U.S, (1994), vol. 48, pages 599 - 602, XP000543209 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921015), vol. 16, no. 499, Database accession no. (E - 1280), & JP04185042 A 19920701 (TOSHIBA CORP.) [A] 2,9 * abstract * |