Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0934378

EP0934378 - DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A MIXTURE OF CATIONIC, ANIONIC AND NONIONIC SURFACTANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 11.06.2008  [2008/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Former [1999/32]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HALL, Robin, Gibson
27 Blackfriars Court, Stowell Street
Newcastle upon Tyne NE1 4XB / GB
02 / MOSS, Michael, Alan, John
13 Painshawfield Road, Stocksfield
Northumberland NE43 7DZ / GB
03 / HARTSHORN, Richard, Timothy
139 Dene Road, Wylam
Northumberland NE41 8EY / GB
[1999/32]
Representative(s)Peet, Jillian Wendy , et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE12 9TS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/32]Peet, Jillian Wendy , et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
Application number, filing date97912665.302.10.1997
[1999/32]
WO1997US17782
Priority number, dateGB1996002179118.10.1996         Original published format: GB 9621791
GB1996002179918.10.1996         Original published format: GB 9621799
GB1997000581520.03.1997         Original published format: GB 9705815
[1999/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9817755
Date:30.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0934378
Date:11.08.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1998
[1999/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0934378
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.04.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:C11D1/62, C11D1/14, C11D1/22, C11D1/86, C11D1/72, C11D1/65, C11D1/835
[1999/50]
Former International [1999/32]C11D1/62, C11D1/14, C11D1/22, C11D1/86, C11D1/72
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/32]
TitleGerman:WASCHMITTEL ENTHALTEND EIN GEMISCH AUS KATIONISCHEN, ANIONISCHEN UND NICHTIONISCHEN TENSIDEN[1999/32]
English:DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A MIXTURE OF CATIONIC, ANIONIC AND NONIONIC SURFACTANTS[1999/32]
French:COMPOSITIONS DETERGENTES COMPRENANT UN MELANGE DE TENSIOACTIFS CATIONIQUES, ANIONIQUES ET NON IONIQUES[1999/32]
Entry into regional phase19.04.1999National basic fee paid 
19.04.1999Search fee paid 
19.04.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
19.04.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.04.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.04.1999Examination requested  [1999/32]
25.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.08.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
24.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.04.2003Fee for grant paid
02.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Request for further processing for:24.10.2002Request for further processing filed
24.10.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.11.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
09.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
07.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.06.2003
CH11.06.2003
FI11.06.2003
GR11.06.2003
LI11.06.2003
DK11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
SE11.09.2003
IE02.10.2003
LU02.10.2003
[2008/24]
Former [2005/03]AT11.06.2003
CH11.06.2003
FI11.06.2003
LI11.06.2003
DK11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
SE11.09.2003
IE02.10.2003
LU02.10.2003
Former [2004/39]AT11.06.2003
CH11.06.2003
FI11.06.2003
LI11.06.2003
DK11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
SE11.09.2003
LU02.10.2003
Former [2004/29]AT11.06.2003
CH11.06.2003
FI11.06.2003
LI11.06.2003
DK11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
SE11.09.2003
Former [2004/10]AT11.06.2003
CH11.06.2003
FI11.06.2003
LI11.06.2003
PT11.09.2003
SE11.09.2003
Former [2004/05]AT11.06.2003
CH11.06.2003
FI11.06.2003
LI11.06.2003
PT11.09.2003
Former [2004/03]AT11.06.2003
CH11.06.2003
LI11.06.2003
PT11.09.2003
Former [2004/02]CH11.06.2003
LI11.06.2003
PT11.09.2003
Former [2004/01]CH11.06.2003
LI11.06.2003
Documents cited:Search[PX]WO9703164  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [PX] 1-8,13,17,19-21 * examples 8-10 * * claims 1-14 *;
 [PX]US5622925  (DE BUZZACCARINI FRANCESCO [US], et al) [PX] 1,4-6,8,13,17,19,20 * claims 1-26 *;
 [X]US5466394  (DE BUZZACCARINI FRANCESCO [US], et al) [X] 1,4-8,13,17,19,20 * claims 1-19 *;
 [PX]WO9719155  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [PX] 1,4-8,13,17,19,20 * page 14; example A * * claim 1 *;
 [EL]WO9745513  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [EL] 1-11,13,17,20,21 * page 18, line 4 - page 20, line 25 * * examples 5-8 * * claims 1-17 *;
 [A]EP0294894  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,4-8,13,14,17-21 * claims 1-8 *
International search[X]US4264466  (CARLETON KAREN L, et al);
 [X]US4321157  (HARRIS RICHARD G, et al);
 [X]US4333862  (SMITH RORY J M, et al);
 [X]US4338204  (SPADINI GIANFRANCO L, et al);
 [X]US4347168  (MURPHY ALAN P, et al);
 [X]US4444674  (GRAY IAN [GB]);
 [X]US4678594  (PARFOMAK EVA H [US], et al);
 [X]US5009804  (CLAYTON SIMON N [GB], et al);
 [X]US5560748  (SURUTZIDIS ATHANASIOS [US], et al);
 [XP]US5668073  (CONVENTS ANDRE CHRISTIAN [BE], et al);
 [XE]US5679630  (BAECK ANDRE [BE], et al);
 [X]US4132680  (NICOL CHARLES H);
 [X]US5378409  (OFOSU-ASANTE KOFI [US])