Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1021717

EP1021717 - METHOD OF SORTING BIRDS IN OVO [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2003
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI
published on 29.09.2004  [2004/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EMBREX INC.
P.O. Box 13989 Research Triangle Park
North Carolina 27709-3989 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]For all designated states
EMBREX INC.
P.O. Box 13989
Research Triangle Park North Carolina 27709-3989 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PHELPS, Patricia, V.
8313 Nantahala Drive
Raleigh, NC 27612 / US
[2000/30]
Representative(s)Harrison, Michael Robert
Harrison Goddard Foote
Belgrave Hall
Belgrave Street
Leeds
LS1 8DD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]Harrison, Michael Robert
Harrison Goddard Foote, Tower House, Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date97912688.503.10.1997
[2000/30]
WO1997US18251
Priority number, dateUS19960027000P04.10.1996         Original published format: US 27000 P
[2000/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9814781
Date:09.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1021717
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.1998
[2000/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1021717
Date:10.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.04.1998
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/50, G01N33/74, A01K67/00
[2000/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/30]
TitleGerman:METHODE ZUR GESCHLECHTSBESTIMMUNG VON VÖGELN IN OVO[2000/30]
English:METHOD OF SORTING BIRDS IN OVO[2000/30]
French:PROCEDE SERVANT A DETERMINER LE SEXE DE VOLATILES IN OVO[2000/30]
Entry into regional phase09.02.1999National basic fee paid 
09.02.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
09.02.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.04.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.02.1999Examination requested  [2000/30]
15.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
07.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
12.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.12.2001Fee for grant paid
13.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.04.2002
CH10.04.2002
FI10.04.2002
GR10.04.2002
LI10.04.2002
PT10.07.2002
SE10.07.2002
IE03.10.2002
LU03.10.2002
[2004/40]
Former [2004/39]AT10.04.2002
CH10.04.2002
GR10.04.2002
LI10.04.2002
PT10.07.2002
SE10.07.2002
IE03.10.2002
LU03.10.2002
Former [2004/01]AT10.04.2002
CH10.04.2002
GR10.04.2002
LI10.04.2002
PT10.07.2002
SE10.07.2002
IE03.10.2002
Former [2003/21]AT10.04.2002
CH10.04.2002
GR10.04.2002
LI10.04.2002
PT10.07.2002
SE10.07.2002
Former [2003/19]AT10.04.2002
CH10.04.2002
GR10.04.2002
LI10.04.2002
SE10.07.2002
Former [2003/16]AT10.04.2002
CH10.04.2002
LI10.04.2002
SE10.07.2002
Former [2003/10]AT10.04.2002
SE10.07.2002
Former [2002/42]SE10.07.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0433084  (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9009188  (TEXAS A & M UNIV SYS [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5508165  (HALVERSON JOY L [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2441378  (PARIS ORGANO CHIMIE LAB) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - WENIGER J.P., "Embryonic Sex Hormones in Birds", INT. J. DEV. BIOL., (1991), pages 1 - 8, XP002056536 [X] 1-36 * the whole document *
 [X]  - WENIGER J.P, "Recherches sur la Nature Chimique des Hormones Sexuelles Embryonnaires de Poulot", ANN. EMBRYOL. MORPHOG., (1969), vol. 2, pages 433 - 444, XP002056537 [X] 1-36 * the whole document *