Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1009551

EP1009551 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THE TREATMENT OF CHEMICAL WASTES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.05.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THERMATRIX INC.
Suite 132, 2025 Gateway Place
San Jose, CA 95110 / US
[2000/25]
Inventor(s)01 / HEYWOOD, Ann, C.
4084 Sugar Maple Drive
Danville, CA 94506 / US
02 / MARTIN, Richard, J.
1377 Poe Lane
San Jose, CA 95130 / US
03 / STILGER, John, D.
6495 Camelia Drive
San Jose, CA 95120 / US
04 / KING, Andrew, B.
Winns Cottage, Sand Hutton
Thirsk, North Yorkshire Y07 4RW / GB
[2000/25]
Representative(s)Hallybone, Huw George
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]Hallybone, Huw George
CARPMAELS AND RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date97912721.415.10.1997
[2000/25]
WO1997US18541
Priority number, dateUS1996072985015.10.1996         Original published format: US 729850
[2000/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9816332
Date:23.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1009551
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.1998
[2000/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1009551
Date:09.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/28]
Search report(s)International search reportUS23.04.1998
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP28.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B09B3/00, F23B7/00, F23D14/00, F23D21/00, F23G5/00, F23G5/12, F23G5/44, F23G7/00, F23G7/04, F23G7/08, F23J15/00
[2000/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/25]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON CHEMISCHEM ABFALL[2000/25]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THE TREATMENT OF CHEMICAL WASTES[2000/25]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE DECHETS CHIMIQUES[2000/25]
Entry into regional phase06.05.1999National basic fee paid 
06.05.1999Search fee paid 
06.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
06.05.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.04.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.05.1999Examination requested  [2000/25]
05.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.03.2003Fee for grant paid
11.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200004   M06   Fee paid on   13.12.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.07.2003
CH09.07.2003
FI09.07.2003
LI09.07.2003
DK09.10.2003
GR09.10.2003
SE09.10.2003
LU15.10.2003
MC31.10.2003
PT09.12.2003
[2005/02]
Former [2004/39]AT09.07.2003
CH09.07.2003
FI09.07.2003
LI09.07.2003
DK09.10.2003
GR09.10.2003
SE09.10.2003
LU15.10.2003
PT09.12.2003
Former [2004/29]AT09.07.2003
CH09.07.2003
FI09.07.2003
LI09.07.2003
DK09.10.2003
GR09.10.2003
SE09.10.2003
PT09.12.2003
Former [2004/22]AT09.07.2003
CH09.07.2003
FI09.07.2003
LI09.07.2003
GR09.10.2003
SE09.10.2003
PT09.12.2003
Former [2004/16]AT09.07.2003
FI09.07.2003
GR09.10.2003
SE09.10.2003
PT09.12.2003
Former [2004/14]AT09.07.2003
FI09.07.2003
GR09.10.2003
PT09.12.2003
Former [2004/13]FI09.07.2003
PT09.12.2003
Former [2004/12]FI09.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[X]SU1393994  (PNII MOSGAZNIIPROEKT [SU], et al) [X] 1,8
 [X]  HOWELL J R ET AL, "Combustion of hydrocarbon fuels within porous inert media", PROGRESS IN ENERGY AND COMBUSTION SCIENCE,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, (19960101), vol. 22, no. 2, ISSN 0360-1285, pages 121 - 145, XP004040981 [X] 1,8 * page 134, column R, line 13 - page 135, column L, line 10 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0360-1285(96)00001-9
    [] 1, Database accession no. 1988-328951, [ ] * abstract *
International search[X]US4823711  (KRONEBERGER GERALD F [US], et al);
 [X]US4688495  (GALLOWAY TERRY R [US])
by applicantUS4688495
 US5165884
 US5320518
 US4823711
 US5533890