Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1075451

EP1075451 - SPILL-REDUCTION CAP FOR FLUID CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.06.2002
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2002Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawnpublished on 24.07.2002  [2002/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PORTOLA PACKAGING, INC.
890 Faulstich Court San Jose
California 95112 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/07]For all designated states
PORTOLA PACKAGING, INC.
890 Faulstich Court
San Jose California 95112 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ADAMS, Brian, M.
890 Faulstich Court
San Jose, CA 95112 / US
02 / PHAM, Hoa
890 Faulstich Court
San Jose, CA 95112 / US
03 / LUCH, Daniel
890 Faulstich Court
San Jose, CA 95112 / US
 [2001/07]
Representative(s)McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/07]McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell , et al
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date97912797.414.10.1997
[2001/07]
WO1997US18888
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9919225
Date:22.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1075451
Date:14.02.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.1999
[2001/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.04.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:B67D3/00, B65D41/48
[2001/11]
Former International [2001/07]B67D3/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT [2001/07]
TitleGerman:SPRITZGESICHERTE KAPPE FÜR FLÜSSIGKEITSBEHÄLTER[2001/07]
English:SPILL-REDUCTION CAP FOR FLUID CONTAINER[2001/07]
French:BOUCHON REDUISANT LES FUITES, POUR RECIPIENT A FLUIDE[2001/07]
Entry into regional phase02.05.2000National basic fee paid 
02.05.2000Search fee paid 
02.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
02.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
02.05.2000Examination requested  [2001/07]
19.04.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/15]
05.06.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/30]
15.08.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
04.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200105   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5662231  (ADAMS BRIAN M [US], et al) [Y] 1-9,11-23 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5397023  (TOCZEK THOMAS R [US], et al) [Y] 1-9,11-23 * column 1, line 62 - line 68 * * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 3 * * column 5, line 18 - line 39; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US4699188  (BAKER HENRY E [US], et al) [A] 1,21 * column 4, line 38 - line 54 * * column 5, line 8 - line 31 * * column 6, line 1 - line 7; figures 1,2 *;
 [E]US5687867  (LAMOUREUX RICHARD [CA]) [E] 1,21 * abstract *;
 [E]WO9803426  (CREALISE PACKAGING INC [CA], et al) [E] 1,21 * abstract *
International search[Y]US5513763  (ADAMS BRIAN M [US], et al);
 [Y]US5202093  (CLOYD WILLLIAM C [US]);
 [Y]US5232125  (ADAMS BRIAN M [US]);
 [Y]US5662231  (ADAMS BRIAN M [US], et al);
 [E]US5687865  (ADAMS BRIAN M [US], et al)