Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1016009

EP1016009 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANAGING AND SERVING CONSUMER PRODUCT RELATED INFORMATION OVER THE INTERNET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  18.09.2009
Database last updated on 20.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.09.2009Refusal of applicationpublished on 21.10.2009  [2009/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IPF, Inc.
10 Waldon Road
Darien, CT 06820 / US
[2000/27]
Inventor(s)01 / PERKOWSKI, Thomas, J.
10 Waldon Road
Darien, CT 06820 / US
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/08]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
R G C Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Former [2000/27]Whitten, George Alan , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date97912893.127.10.1997
[2000/27]
WO1997US19227
Priority number, dateUS1996073679825.10.1996         Original published format: US 736798
US1996075213619.11.1996         Original published format: US 752136
US1997082612027.03.1997         Original published format: US 826120
US1997085487712.05.1997         Original published format: US 854877
US1997087181509.06.1997         Original published format: US 871815
US1997093637524.09.1997         Original published format: US 936375
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9819259
Date:07.05.1998
Language:EN
[1998/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1016009
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.1998
[2000/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.05.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60, G06F17/30
[2002/20]
Former International [2000/27]G06F17/60
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/27]
Extension statesLV21.05.1999
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG UND ÜBERTRAGUNG VON VERBRAUCHERPRODUKTBEZOGENER INFORMATION ÜBER INTERNET[2000/27]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANAGING AND SERVING CONSUMER PRODUCT RELATED INFORMATION OVER THE INTERNET[2000/27]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE GERER ET DE TRANSMETTRE SUR INTERNET DES INFORMATIONS RELATIVES A DES PRODUITS DE CONSOMMATION[2000/27]
Entry into regional phase21.05.1999National basic fee paid 
21.05.1999Search fee paid 
21.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.05.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
14.04.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.05.1999Examination requested  [2000/27]
02.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
22.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.03.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
08.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.2009Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.06.2009
25.05.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
04.06.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/43]
09.06.2009Date of oral proceedings
09.06.2009Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
14.06.2009Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/43]
Request for further processing for:08.06.2007Request for further processing filed
08.06.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.06.2007Decision despatched
22.07.2003Request for further processing filed
22.07.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.08.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
22.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200509   M06   Fee paid on   22.12.2005
31.10.200711   M06   Fee paid on   14.01.2008
31.10.200812   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YA]US5319542  (KING JR JOHN E [US], et al) [Y] 3-5,7,14,15 * column 3, lines 15-59 * * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 29 * [A] 1,2,6;
 [A]WO9515533  (BURKE RAYMOND R [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5528490  (HILL CHARLES E [US]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * figures 7,11 *;
 [PX]WO9701137  (SOLAR COMMUNICATIONS INC [US]) [PX] 1-16 * abstract * * figure - * * page 8, line 10 - page 17, line 2 *;
 [PA]EP0744856  (AT & T CORP [US]) [PA] 1-16 * figures 1-7 * * column 2, line 15 - column 4, line 13 *
 [Y]  SCHWARTZ, S., "Ordering it right the first time: the UPC electronic catalog and EDI", EDI FORUM (USA), EDI FORUM, 1992, USA, (1992), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 58 - 62, XP002191634 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [Y]  SEGEV A., WAN D, BEAM C., "Electronic Catalogs: a Technology Overview and Survey Results", PROCEEDINGS ACM CIKM'95 CONF., BALTIMORE, MD, USA, 1995, PAGES 11-18, XP002191635 [Y] 1,2,6,8,16 * page 11, column R, paragraph 2 * * Sections 2, 3.4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/221270.221284
 [YA]  KELLER A M, "Smart catalogs and virtual catalogs", PROCEEDINGS OF THE USENIX WORKSHOP OF ELECTRONIC COMMERCE, XX, XX, (19950711), pages 125 - 131, XP002086428 [Y] 13 * page 125 * * page 128, column L, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 1,2,6
 [YA]  LEIPZIG M., "Customer-Operated Price Verifiers", ID SYSTEMS EUROPEAN EDITION, JAN. 1996, HELMERS PUBLISHING, PAGES 32, 36, vol. 4, no. 1, XP002191636 [Y] 9-12 * the whole document * [A] 8,16
International search[X]US4654482  (DEANGELIS LAWRENCE J [US]);
 [X]US5483052  (SMITH III HERBERT J [US], et al);
 [XP]US5592378  (CAMERON PAUL S [US], et al);
 [AP]US5612527  (OVADIA VICTOR A [US]);
 [XE]US5715444  (DANISH MOHAMED SHERIF [US], et al);
 [XL]US5719828  (HAAS SANDRA F [US], et al)