Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0880306

EP0880306 - ORGANIC EL ELEMENT AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  22.03.2002
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.03.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 08.05.2002  [2002/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TDK Corporation
13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-0027 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/48]For all designated states
TDK Corporation
13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-0027 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ARAI, Michio
TDK Corporation, 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103 / JP
02 / NAKAYA, Kenji
TDK Corporation, 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103 / JP
03 / ONITSUKA, Osamu
TDK Corporation, 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103 / JP
04 / MORI, Masami
TDK Corporation, 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103 / JP
[1998/48]
Representative(s)Wise, Stephen James , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/48]Wise, Stephen James , et al
c/o RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK 36 Sydenham Road
Croydon, Surrey CR0 2EF / GB
Application number, filing date97913447.526.11.1997
[1998/48]
WO1997JP04311
Priority number, dateJP1996033163227.11.1996         Original published format: JP 33163296
[1998/48]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9824273
Date:04.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0880306
Date:25.11.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998
[1998/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.06.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:H05B33/26, H05B33/04, H05B33/10
[1998/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   NL [1998/48]
TitleGerman:ORGANISCHES ELEKTROLUMINISIERTES ELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DESSELBEN[1998/48]
English:ORGANIC EL ELEMENT AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME[1998/48]
French:ELEMENT ELECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DUDIT ELEMENT[1998/48]
Entry into regional phase29.07.1998Translation filed 
18.08.1998National basic fee paid 
18.08.1998Search fee paid 
18.08.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
18.08.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.08.1998Examination requested  [1998/48]
13.03.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search   [] No further relevant documents disclosed,
International search[X]JPH07192866  (RICOH KK);
 [X]JPH0696858  (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD);
 [X]JPH01168995U  ;
 [Y]JPH04212284  (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH04212287  (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD);
 [XP]JPH09151371  (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD)