Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0891434

EP0891434 - HEAT-FUSIBLE COMPOSITE FIBER AND NON-WOVEN FABRIC PRODUCED FROM THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2002
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chisso Corporation
6-32, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-6591 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
CHISSO CORPORATION
6-32, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 530-6591 / JP
Former [1999/03]For all designated states
CHISSO CORPORATION
6-32, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KATAOKA, Yukinori
7, Ikedamachi 3-chome
Oumihachiman-shi, Shiga 523 / JP
02 / KOJIMA, Mitsuru
251, Tateiricho
Moriyama-shi, Shiga 524 / JP
03 / SUZUKI, Masayasu
33-3-312, Sakae, Yasucho
Yasu-gun, Shiga 520-23 / JP
[1999/03]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/03]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date97913451.726.11.1997
[1999/03]
WO1997JP04321
Priority number, dateJP1996035602525.12.1996         Original published format: JP 35602596
[1999/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9829586
Date:09.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0891434
Date:20.01.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1998
[1999/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0891434
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:D01F8/06, D04H1/42, D04H1/54
[1999/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   IT [1999/03]
TitleGerman:HEISSSIEGELBARE VERBUNDFASER UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTER VLIESSTOFF[1999/03]
English:HEAT-FUSIBLE COMPOSITE FIBER AND NON-WOVEN FABRIC PRODUCED FROM THE SAME[1999/03]
French:FIBRE COMPOSITE THERMOFUSIBLE ET NON-TISSE PRODUIT AVEC UNE TELLE FIBRE[1999/03]
Entry into regional phase24.09.1998National basic fee paid 
24.09.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
24.09.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.09.1998Examination requested  [1999/03]
26.10.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.02.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2001Fee for grant paid
25.01.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT23.05.2001
[2008/07]
Cited inInternational search[A]JPH06108310  ;
 [A]JPH0418121  ;
 [A]EP0557889  (CHISSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0518690  (CHISSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH06330444
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 20, Database accession no. 94-164465, XP002057190 & JPH06108310 A 19940419 (CHISSO CORP) [A] 1-7 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 10, Database accession no. 92-075271, XP002057191 & JPH0418121 A 19920122 (CHISSO CORP) [A] 1-7 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 07, Database accession no. 95-049476, XP002057192 & JPH06330444 A 19941129 (UBE NITTO KASEI CO) [A] 1-7 * abstract *