Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0900774

EP0900774 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF ACROLEIN AND ACRYLIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  01.02.2008
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 01.10.2008  [2008/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA
11-2, Fujimi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 102-0071 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/10]For all designated states
NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA
11-2, Fujimi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 102-0071 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / WADA, Koichi
2-14-2, Soyagi
Yamato-shi, Kanagawa-ken 242 / JP
02 / SEO, Yoshimasa
2959-1, Ooaza-Koori, Sanyo-cho
Asa-gun, Yamaguchi-ken 757 / JP
03 / IWAMOTO, Akira
187-11, Ooaza-Kiwanami
Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 759-02 / JP
04 / SUDO, Atsushi
340-4, Haraichi
Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken 379-01 / JP
05 / SAKAI, Fumio
1192, Hodota, Gunma-machi
Gunma-gun, Gunma-ken 370-35 / JP
06 / SHIRAISHI, Kazuo
208, Ohya
Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken 379-01 / JP
07 / NOWATARI, Hiroyoshi
762-31, Kuragano-machi
Takasaki-shi, Gunma-ken 370-12 / JP
[1999/10]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/10]Türk, Gille, Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date97913495.402.12.1997
[1999/10]
WO1997JP04402
Priority number, dateJP1996033629803.12.1996         Original published format: JP 33629896
[1999/10]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9824746
Date:11.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0900774
Date:10.03.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1998
[1999/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0900774
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.06.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07C27/14, C07C47/22, C07C45/35, C07C57/05, B01J23/88, B01J27/192, C07C51/25, C07C57/04, B01J23/887, B01J23/31, // C07B61/00
[2000/10]
Former International [1999/10]C07C27/14, C07C47/22, C07C45/35, C07C57/05, B01J23/88, B01J27/192, // C07B61/00
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB [1999/10]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ACROLEIN UND ACRYLSÄURE[1999/10]
English:PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF ACROLEIN AND ACRYLIC ACID[1999/10]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'ACROLEINE ET D'ACIDE ACRYLIQUE[1999/10]
Entry into regional phase29.07.1998Translation filed 
29.07.1998National basic fee paid 
29.07.1998Search fee paid 
29.07.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
13.11.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/10]
04.03.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.06.2002Fee for grant paid
10.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.11.2002  04.12.2002  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 02  30.05.2003  12.06.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Nippon Shokubai Company Limited
1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541 / JP
Opponent's representative
Schön, Christoph
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/31]
Opponent(s)01  26.11.2002  04.12.2002  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 02  30.05.2003  12.06.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Nippon Shokubai Company Limited
1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541 / JP
Opponent's representative
Schön, Christoph
Patentanwälte Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
Former [2003/30]
Opponent(s)01  26.11.2002  04.12.2002  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft Patente, Marken und Lizenzen
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 02  30.05.2003   
Nippon Shokubai Company Limited
1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541 / JP
Opponent's representative
Schön, Christoph
Patentanwälte Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37
81675 München / DE
Former [2003/03]
Opponent(s)01  26.11.2002  04.12.2002  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft Patente, Marken und Lizenzen
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
09.07.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.01.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.02.2005Date of oral proceedings
04.04.2005Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.04.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
25.10.2007Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/10]
Appeal following opposition01.06.2005Appeal received No.  T0728/05
12.08.2005Statement of grounds filed
25.10.2007Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
25.10.2007Date of oral proceedings
05.11.2007Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR31.12.2006
[2008/40]
Documents cited:Search[X]US4837360  (KADOWAKI KOJU ET AL) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0456837  (NIPPON SHOKUBAI KAGAKU KOGYO CO LTD) [Y] 1-12 * claim 1 *;
 [Y]GB2063861  (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *
International search[X]JPH083093  ;
 [A]JPH03294239