Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0900774 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0900774



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 938
31.01.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
24.06.2008 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
30.01.2008 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
11.12.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
08.12.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
08.12.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.12.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.12.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.12.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
05.12.2007 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 13
05.11.2007 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 13
02.10.2007 F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation Appeal 1
02.10.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
26.09.2007 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
26.09.2007 Claims Appeal 2
26.09.2007 Claims Appeal 3
26.09.2007 F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet Appeal 2
26.09.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
25.09.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 10
06.09.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
01.09.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
31.08.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.08.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
02.08.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
02.08.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
02.08.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
02.08.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.08.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
02.08.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 25
02.08.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
02.08.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.07.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
16.07.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.07.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
12.07.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
12.07.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.07.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.07.2007 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 6
05.07.2007 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
01.06.2007 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
12.12.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
12.12.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
01.12.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
10.10.2005 Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
04.10.2005 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 3
25.08.2005 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
16.08.2005 Claims Appeal 3
16.08.2005 Claims Appeal 3
16.08.2005 Description Appeal 12
16.08.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
12.08.2005 Claims Appeal 3
12.08.2005 Claims Appeal 3
12.08.2005 Description Appeal 12
12.08.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
25.07.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
20.06.2005 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.06.2005 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 2
06.06.2005 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
02.06.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
01.06.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
12.05.2005 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
11.04.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.04.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.04.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.04.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.04.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.04.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.04.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
04.04.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
04.04.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
04.04.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 5
04.04.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
04.04.2005 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
04.04.2005 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
04.04.2005 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 10
04.04.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
04.04.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
04.04.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
04.04.2005 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.03.2005 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.01.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.01.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.01.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.01.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.01.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.01.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2005 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2005 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
07.01.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.01.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.01.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.01.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.01.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
31.12.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
31.12.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
30.12.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 10
29.12.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 14
29.12.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
29.12.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
17.08.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.08.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.08.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.08.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.08.2004 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.08.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.08.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.08.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.08.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.08.2004 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
03.08.2004 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.08.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
03.08.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
03.08.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
23.04.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.04.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.04.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.02.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.02.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.01.2004 Claims Opposition 3
22.01.2004 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 10
21.01.2004 Claims Opposition 3
21.01.2004 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 10
14.11.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.11.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.11.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
03.11.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
11.07.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
11.07.2003 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
11.07.2003 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.07.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.07.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.06.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.06.2003 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
10.06.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.06.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
30.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 3
30.05.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 23
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 10
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 4
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 8
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 1
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 3
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 67
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 6
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 8
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 67
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 6
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 5
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 1
30.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 7
03.12.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
26.11.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
26.11.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
26.11.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
26.11.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
26.11.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
26.11.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 10
25.07.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.06.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
06.06.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
06.06.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
28.03.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
15.03.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
08.01.2002 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
08.01.2002 Translation of priority document Search / examination 29
28.11.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
28.11.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.11.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
13.09.2001 Claims Search / examination 3
13.09.2001 Description Search / examination 18
13.09.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.07.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
03.07.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.05.2001 Claims Search / examination 1
25.05.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
26.02.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
26.02.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.03.2000 Claims Search / examination 3
04.03.2000 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 2
28.01.2000 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
25.01.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
25.01.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.01.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
27.01.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
12.11.1998 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
01.09.1998 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
29.07.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.07.1998 Claims Search / examination 2
29.07.1998 Description Search / examination 17
29.07.1998 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
29.07.1998 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
11.06.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
11.06.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 22
11.06.1998 Priority document Search / examination 22