Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971873

EP0971873 - ASIATIC ACID DERIVATIVES AND MEDICINES FOR TREATING WOUNDS, WHICH CONTAINS THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.01.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.03.2004  [2004/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DONG KOOK PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
997-8 Daechi-dong Kangnam-gu
Seoul 135-280 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
DONG KOOK PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
997-8 Daechi-dong
Kangnam-gu, Seoul 135-280 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / JEW, Sang, Sup
6-404, Sorak Apt. Chamwon-dong
Socho-gu Seoul 137-795 / KR
02 / PARK, Hyeung, Geun
207, East Building Hoam Faculty Apt.
Pongchon 7-dong Kwanak-gu Seoul 151-057 / KR
03 / PARK, Hyeung, Geun
102-1005, Samik Apt. Shinsu-dong
Mapo-gu Seoul 121-110 / KR
04 / JUNG, Young, Hoon
913-501, Jugong Apt. Burim-dong
Kwachon Kyunggi-do 427-050 / KR
05 / PARK, Eun, Hee
1-309, Wangkung Apt. Dongbuichon-dong
Yongsan-gu Seoul 140-031 / KR
06 / KIM, Hong, Pyo
17-1308, Shiyong Apt. Songsan-dong
Mapo-gu Seoul 121-781 / KR
07 / SEO, Sung, Ki
107-207, Buwon Parktown Tokpo 2-dong
Sasang-gu Pusan 617-042 / KR
08 / NAM, Tae, Gyu
230-19, Pokdae-dong Hungdok-gu
Chongju Chungchongbuk-do 361-270 / KR
09 / HAN, Ducky
643-67, Chonnong 1-dong
Tongdaemun-gu Seoul 130-021 / KR
10 / YOO, Chi, Hyoung
4-1201, Samsung Apt. Mangmi 1-dong
Suyong-gu Pusan 613-131 / KR
11 / LIM, Doo, Yeon
3-205, Gaenari Apt. Yeoksam 2-dong
Kangnam-gu Seoul 135-795 / KR
12 / KIM, Jeong, Hoon
A-1402, Sungbo Apt. Yeoksam 2-dong
Kangnam-gu Seoul 135-082 / KR
13 / KIM, Hee, Man
208-905, Mido Apt. Taechi 2-dong
Kangnam-gu Seoul 135-775 / KR
14 / LEE, Mi, Kyeong
111-907, Hyundai Apt. Shillim 2-dong
Kwanak-gu Seoul 151-761 / KR
15 / LIM, Kyung, Hwa
88-20, Ssangmun 3-dong
Tobong-gu Seoul 132-033 / KR
16 / LIM, Min, Jung
101-107, Jinro Apt. Tangsan-dong 1-ga
Yongdungpo-gu Seoul 150-041 / KR
17 / KIM, Do, Ha
306-65, Tangni-dong
Saha-gu Pusan 604-010 / KR
18 / KIM, So, Yeon
207-1114, Woosung Apt. Sadang 2-dong
Tongjak-gu Seoul 156-773 / KR
19 / SHIM, Pil, Jong
309-605, Hundai Apt. Kwangjang-dong
Kwangjin-gu Seoul 143-210 / KR
20 / BEOM, Hee, Young
243, Samson-dong 5-ga
Songbuk-ku Seoul 136-045 / KR
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Hubert, Philippe , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Hubert, Philippe , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date97913517.527.11.1997
[2000/03]
WO1997KR00239
Priority number, dateKR1996000581727.11.1996         Original published format: KR 9605817
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9823574
Date:04.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971873
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AT04.06.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07C62/32, C07D319/08, A61K31/19, C07C69/757
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/03]
TitleGerman:ASIATSAEURE-DERIVATE UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE MEDIKAMENTE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON WUNDEN[2000/03]
English:ASIATIC ACID DERIVATIVES AND MEDICINES FOR TREATING WOUNDS, WHICH CONTAINS THE SAME[2000/03]
French:DERIVES D'ACIDE ASIATIQUE ET MEDICAMENTS LES CONTENANT AUX FINS DU TRAITEMENT DE PLAIES[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase25.05.1999National basic fee paid 
25.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.05.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT
26.05.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
06.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
19.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/10]
24.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
23.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200307   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9617819  (DONG KOOK PHARM CO LTD [KR]);
 [X]JP06329590
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 125, No. 7, 12 August 1996, (Columbus, Ohio, USA), page 706, Abstract No. 81911x, C. FOURNEAU et al., "Triterpenes from Prunus Africana Bark"; & PHYTOCHEMISTRY, 1996, 42(5), 1391-1393.,
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 122, No. 15, 10 April 1995, (Columbus, Ohio, USA), page 874, Abstract No. 185527f, N. OKADA et al., "A Triterpene, Its Manufacture and Cancer Inhibitors Containing Triterpenes"; & JP,A,06 329 590.,
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 118, No. 21, 24 May 1993, (Columbus, Ohio, USA), pages 536-537, Abstract No. 209385d, C. HUANG et al., "Isolation and Identification of a New Triterpene from Actinidia Eriantha Benth."; & TIANRAN CHANWU YANJIU YU KAIFA, 1992, 4(3), 27-30.,
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 109, No. 15, 10 October 1998, (Columbus, Ohio, USA), page 390, Abstract No. 125856j, C. HUANG et al., "Isolation and Identification of Two New Triterpenes from Actinidia Eriantha"; & YUNNAN ZHIWU YANJIU, 1988, 10(1), 93-100.,
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 102, No. 7, 18 February 1985, (Columbus, Ohio, USA), page 351, Abstract No. 59349y, T. KIKUCHI et al., "Studies on the Constituents of Medicinal and Related Plants in Sri Lanka. I. New Triterpenes from Hedyotis Lawsoniae"; & CHEM. PHARM. BULL., 1984, 32(10), 3906-11.,
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 100, No. 21, 21 May 1984, (Columbus, Ohio, USA), page 353, Abstract No. 171516k, J. SAKAKIBARA et al., "Terpenoids of Rhododendron Japonicum"; & PHYTOCHEMISTRY, 1983, 22(11), 2535-5.,
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 76, No. 9, 28 February 1982, (Columbus, Ohio, USA), page 2, Abstract No. 41801z, L.F. CHASSEAUD et al., "Metabolism of Asiatic Acid, Madecassic Acid and Asiaticoside in the Rat"; & ARZNEIM.-FORSCHUNG, 1971, 21(9), 1379-84.,