Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0891591

EP0891591 - AN INTERNET SERVER AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING AN INTERNET SERVER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2000
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.01.2001 [2001/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company
81 Newgate Street London
EC1A 7AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/03]For all designated states
BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company
81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / ANTCLIFF, Stuart, James
2 Blakes Close, Melton
Woodbridge, Suffolk IP12 1RQ / GB
02 / REGNAULT, John, Christopher
51 Woodbridge Road, Newbourne
Woodbridge, Suffolk IP12 4PA / GB
03 / BRADLEY, Laurence, Daniel
15 Kentwell Close
Ipswich, Suffolk IP4 5BQ / GB
[1999/03]
Representative(s)Evershed, Michael
BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department, PP C5A BT Centre 81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/03]Evershed, Michael
BT Group Legal Services, Intellectual Property Department, 8th Floor, Holborn Centre, 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2TE / GB
Application number, filing date97914435.925.03.1997
[1999/03]
WO1997GB00835
Priority number, dateGB1996000715204.04.1996         Original published format: GB 9607152
[1999/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9738375
Date:16.10.1997
Language:EN
[1997/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0891591
Date:20.01.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.1997
[1999/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0891591
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.10.1997
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30, H04L29/06
[1999/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL [1999/03]
TitleGerman:EIN INTERNET-SERVER UND EIN VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINES INTERNET-SERVERS[1999/03]
English:AN INTERNET SERVER AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING AN INTERNET SERVER[1999/03]
French:SERVEUR INTERNET ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'UN SERVEUR INTERNET[1999/03]
Entry into regional phase18.09.1998National basic fee paid 
18.09.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
18.09.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.10.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.09.1998Examination requested  [1999/03]
01.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
09.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
30.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.1999Fee for grant paid
22.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]  - LEWONTIN S, "The DCE Web toolkit: enhancing WWW protocols with lower-layer services", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, (19950401), vol. 27, no. 6, pages 765 - 771, XP000498084 [X] 1-3,7,15-17,21 * page 768, column L, paragraph 3.2 - page 769, column L, paragraph 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-7552(95)00032-3
 [A]  - CHU J Y M ET AL, "Creating a hypertext markup language document for an information server", 24TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY FOR COMPUTERS IN PSYCHOLOGY (SCIP), ST. LOUIS, MO, USA, 10 NOV. 1994, ISSN 0743-3808, BEHAVIOR RESEARCH METHODS, INSTRUMENTS, & COMPUTERS, MAY 1995, USA, vol. 27, no. 2, pages 200 - 205, XP000567305 [A] 1-28 * page 203, column R, line 25 - page 205, column R, line 13; figure 1 *
 [A]  - SCHULZRINNE H, "World Wide Web: whence, whither, what next?", IEEE NETWORK, MARCH-APRIL 1996, IEEE, USA, ISSN 0890-8044, vol. 10, no. 2, pages 10 - 17, XP000580078 [A] 1-28 * page 11, column L, line 1 - page 12, column R, line 8 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/65.486966
 [A]  - LEONE A O ET AL, "Towards a user environment integrating hypermedia browsers, scientific visualization programs and numerical simulation programs", PROCEEDINGS OF THE WORKSHOP ON ADVANCED VISUAL INTERFACES AVI 94, PROCEEDINGS OF THE WORKSHOP ON ADVANCED VISUAL INTERFACES AVI, BARI, ITALY, 1-4 JUNE 1994, ISBN 0-89791-733-2, 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA, ACM, USA, pages 234 - 236, XP000571293 [A] 1,15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/192309.192358
 [A]  - VOELKER G M ET AL, "Mobisaic: an information system for a mobile wireless computing environment", PROCEEDINGS. WORKSHOP ON MOBILE COMPUTING SYSTEMS AND APPLICATIONS (CAT. NO.94TH06734), WORKSHOP ON MOBILE COMPUTING SYSTEMS AND APPLICATIONS, SANTA CRUZ, CA, USA, 8-9 DEC. 1994, ISBN 0-8186-6345-6, 1995, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA, IEEE COMPUT. SOC. PRESS, USA, pages 185 - 190, XP000602490 [A] 1,15 * page 187, column L, paragraph 3.1 - column R, paragraph 4 *
by applicant   - LEWONTIN S., "The DCE Web toolkit: enhancing WWW protocols with lower- layer services", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, (199504), vol. 27, no. 6, pages 765 - 771