Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0892752

EP0892752 - CLEANING ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR USE WITH A CONVEYOR BELT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/04]POWER TAKE OFF FROM AN ENDLESS CONVEYOR
[1999/30]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.04.2001
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.06.2001 [2001/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LTA Construction Limited
Jet Park Road, Jet Park
1459 South Africa / ZA
[2001/03]
Former [1999/04]For all designated states
Micklethwaite, Barry
24 Warren Avenue
Stapleford, Nottingham NG9 8EY / GB
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/04]
Representative(s)Jones, Stephen Anthony
AdamsonJones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham
NG1 1GF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]Jones, Stephen Anthony
AdamsonJones Broadway Business Centre 32a Stoney Street
Nottingham NG1 1LL / GB
Former [1999/22]Jones, Stephen Anthony
Lewis & Taylor 49 Stoney Street
Nottingha, NG1 1LX / GB
Former [1999/04]Jones, Stephen Anthony
E. N. Lewis & Taylor 144 New Walk
Leicester LE1 7JA / GB
Application number, filing date97914453.226.03.1997
[1999/04]
WO1997GB00854
Priority number, dateGB1996000699902.04.1996         Original published format: GB 9606999
[1999/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9736807
Date:09.10.1997
Language:EN
[1997/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0892752
Date:27.01.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.1997
[1999/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0892752
Date:28.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/26]
Search report(s)International search reportEP09.10.1997
ClassificationInternational:B65G45/10, B65G23/00
[1999/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/04]
TitleGerman:ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM REINIGEN EINES FÖRDERBANDES[1999/30]
English:CLEANING ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR USE WITH A CONVEYOR BELT[1999/30]
French:DISPOSITIF ET METHODE DE NETTOYAGE UTILISE POUR UN CONVOYEUR SANS FIN[1999/30]
Former [1999/04]ANTRIEBSüBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FüR FöRDERBAND
Former [1999/04]POWER TAKE OFF FROM AN ENDLESS CONVEYOR
Former [1999/04]PRISE DE PUISSANCE POUR CONVOYEUR SANS FIN
Entry into regional phase28.10.1998National basic fee paid 
28.10.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
28.10.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.10.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.10.1998Examination requested  [1999/04]
29.10.1998Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.03.2000Fee for grant paid
02.03.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]US4041785  (ROARK THOMAS J) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4321018  (HURT FRANK K) [X] 1,2,4,5,9 * the whole document *;
 [XA]US4218881  (HUFFMAN ROBERT P [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document * [A] 12;
 [X]AU510039B  (DONCASTER CONVEYOR IMPROV) [X] 1,2,6,7,12-14 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US4024930  (THOMSON RONALD E, et al) [A] 1,3-5 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9429203  (MORIN NORMAND JOSEPH [CA]) [A] 13 * abstract *