Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0894205

EP0894205 - LINEAR ROLLING BEARING WITH LONGITUDINAL SEALING ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2001
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.05.2001 [2001/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INA Wälzlager Schaeffler oHG
91072 Herzogenaurach / DE
[2000/20]
Former [1999/05]For all designated states
INA Wälzlager Schaeffler oHG
91072 Herzogenaurach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MOSEBERG, Ralf
Breslauer Strasse 9
D-66862 Kindsbach / DE
02 / SCHEIB, Frank
Richard-Wagner-Strasse 22
D-66540 Neunkirchen / DE
03 / WELSCH, Annette
Lappentascherstrasse 82
D-66424 Homburg / DE
[1999/05]
Application number, filing date97915388.919.03.1997
[1999/05]
WO1997EP01372
Priority number, dateDE199611579120.04.1996         Original published format: DE 19615791
[1999/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9740280
Date:30.10.1997
Language:DE
[1997/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0894205
Date:03.02.1999
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.1997
[1999/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0894205
Date:17.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.10.1997
ClassificationInternational:F16C29/08
[1999/05]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1999/05]
TitleGerman:LINEARWÄLZLAGER MIT LÄNGSDICHTUNGEN[1999/05]
English:LINEAR ROLLING BEARING WITH LONGITUDINAL SEALING ELEMENTS[1999/05]
French:PALIER A ROULEMENT LINEAIRE MUNI D'ELEMENTS D'ETANCHEITE LONGITUDINAUX[1999/05]
Entry into regional phase26.08.1998National basic fee paid 
26.08.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
26.08.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.08.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.08.1998Examination requested  [1999/05]
03.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.12.1999Fee for grant paid
07.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XA]US5492412  (TSUKADA TORU [JP]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 9 - line 20 * * column 4, line 23 - line 24 * [A] 5;
 [A]US4854741  (MOTTATE TATSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 37 - line 40; figure 4 *;
 [A]US5358336  (AGARI NORIMASA [JP]) [A] 1-4,9 * column W *;
 [A]US5356223  (AGARI NORIMASA [JP]) [A] 1-4,9 * column W *;
 [A]DE3545168  (WILHELM CARL GMBH & CO METALLT [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4443017  (KNOTT HENRY J [US]) [A] 1,2 * column W *;
 [A]US5492343  (SMITH STANLEY N [US], et al) [A] 2-4 * column W *;
 [A]DE4226607  (NIPPON THOMPSON CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
ExaminationEP0594209
 EP0427238
 DE4413373
 DE9311059U