blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0968479 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0968479



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 170
17.05.2006 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
12.07.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
02.06.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.05.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
09.05.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
09.05.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
09.05.2005 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.04.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (grant procedure) Search / examination 1
08.04.2005 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.04.2005 Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant Search / examination 1
10.12.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
10.12.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
10.12.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
29.03.2004 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
08.04.2002 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
24.11.1999 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
24.11.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
24.11.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
30.10.1999 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
30.10.1999 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.10.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.10.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.10.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.10.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.10.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.10.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.10.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.10.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.10.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.10.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.09.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.09.1999 Annex Search / examination 34
21.09.1999 Claims Search / examination 4
21.09.1999 Description Search / examination 12
21.09.1999 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
21.09.1999 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 2
21.09.1999 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 2
21.09.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
20.09.1999 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
17.09.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 1
17.09.1999 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
17.09.1999 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 2
17.09.1999 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
13.01.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
24.09.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
24.09.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 30