Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968479

EP0968479 - A TRANSACTION PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.05.2006
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRINTECH LIMITED
South County Business Park, Leopardstown
Dublin 18 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
TRINTECH LIMITED
South County Business Park, Leopardstown
Dublin 18 / IE
Inventor(s)01 / CLARKE, Patrick
42 Ballyroan Road, Templeogue
Dublin 16 / IE
02 / BURNE, George
27 Fairy Hill
Bray, County Wicklow / IE
03 / O'DONOGHUE, Hubert
20 The Priory, Portrane Road
Donabate, County Dublin / IE
04 / FLOOD, Eoin
20 Eaton Wood Avenue
Shankill, County Dublin / IE
05 / O'SULLIVAN, Timothy
22 The Bently
Kilcoole, County Wicklow / IE
06 / O'ROURKE, Francis
4 Applewood Drive
Greystones, County Wicklow / IE
07 / O'NEIL, David
86 Kilmore Road, Artane
Dublin 5 / IE
08 / McGUIRE, John, Trintech Limited
South County Business Park, Leopardstown
Dublin 18 / IE
09 / MEEHAN, Christopher
11 Cloister Avenue
Blackrock, County Dublin / IE
10 / McGUIRE, Cyril
12 Knocknacree Park
Dalkey, CountyDDublin / IE
[2000/01]
Representative(s)O'Connor, Donal Henry , et al
Cruickshank
8a Sandyford Business Centre
Sandyford
Dublin 18 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]O'Connor, Donal Henry , et al
c/o Cruickshank & Co., 1 Holles Street
Dublin 2 / IE
Application number, filing date97915658.519.03.1997
[2000/01]
WO1997IE00020
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9841940
Date:24.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968479
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968479
Date:13.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:EIN TRANSAKTIONSVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM[2000/01]
English:A TRANSACTION PROCESSING SYSTEM[2000/01]
French:SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT DE TRANSACTIONS[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase17.09.1999National basic fee paid 
17.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
10.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2005Fee for grant paid
09.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.04.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
07.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
17.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
07.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
29.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
29.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
19.10.199903   M06   Fee paid on   03.12.1999
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.07.2005
BE13.07.2005
CH13.07.2005
FI13.07.2005
FR13.07.2005
IT13.07.2005
LI13.07.2005
NL13.07.2005
DK13.10.2005
GR13.10.2005
SE13.10.2005
DE14.10.2005
ES24.10.2005
PT19.12.2005
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2008/07]AT13.07.2005
BE13.07.2005
CH13.07.2005
FI13.07.2005
IT13.07.2005
LI13.07.2005
NL13.07.2005
DK13.10.2005
GR13.10.2005
SE13.10.2005
DE14.10.2005
ES24.10.2005
PT19.12.2005
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
Former [2007/17]AT13.07.2005
BE13.07.2005
CH13.07.2005
FI13.07.2005
LI13.07.2005
NL13.07.2005
DK13.10.2005
GR13.10.2005
SE13.10.2005
DE14.10.2005
ES24.10.2005
PT19.12.2005
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
Former [2006/46]AT13.07.2005
BE13.07.2005
CH13.07.2005
FI13.07.2005
LI13.07.2005
NL13.07.2005
DK13.10.2005
GR13.10.2005
SE13.10.2005
DE14.10.2005
ES24.10.2005
PT19.12.2005
MC31.03.2006
Former [2006/36]AT13.07.2005
BE13.07.2005
CH13.07.2005
FI13.07.2005
LI13.07.2005
NL13.07.2005
DK13.10.2005
GR13.10.2005
SE13.10.2005
DE14.10.2005
ES24.10.2005
PT19.12.2005
Former [2006/26]AT13.07.2005
BE13.07.2005
CH13.07.2005
FI13.07.2005
LI13.07.2005
NL13.07.2005
DK13.10.2005
GR13.10.2005
SE13.10.2005
ES24.10.2005
PT19.12.2005
Former [2006/25]AT13.07.2005
BE13.07.2005
CH13.07.2005
FI13.07.2005
LI13.07.2005
NL13.07.2005
GR13.10.2005
SE13.10.2005
ES24.10.2005
PT19.12.2005
Former [2006/14]AT13.07.2005
CH13.07.2005
FI13.07.2005
LI13.07.2005
NL13.07.2005
GR13.10.2005
SE13.10.2005
ES24.10.2005
PT19.12.2005
Former [2006/13]AT13.07.2005
FI13.07.2005
SE13.10.2005
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9512269  (VISA INT SERVICE ASS [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 2 - page 7, line 17 * * page 39, line 1 - page 40, line 27 * * page 45, line 14 - page 49, line 2 * * page 52, line 14 - page 53, line 3 *;
 [Y]US5280625  (HOWARTER DAVID R [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 9 * * column 3, line 4 - column 11, line 49 *;
 [A]GB2281648  (TURQUOISE HOLDINGS LTD [IE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2, line 4 - page 11, line 7 *;
 [A]  - WALTON J, "Credit card data capture", COMPUTER BULLETIN, JUNE 1986, UK, ISSN 0010-4531, vol. 2, ser.3, pt.2, pages 3 - 5, XP002048299 [A] 1-15 * page 4, column 1, line 5 - line 23 *
 [A]  - LINDEN L F, "Plastic card technology-look for brisk, orderly evolution (financial DP)", MAGAZINE OF BANK ADMINISTRATION, JAN. 1984, USA, ISSN 0024-9823, vol. 60, no. 1, pages 22 - 25, XP002048300 [A] 1-15 * page 22, column 2, line 10 - page 23, column 1, line 6 * * page 23, column 3, line 8 - line 20 * * page 23, column 3, line 37 - page 24, column 1, line 12 * * page 24, column 1, line 33 - column 2, line 9 * * page 24, column 3, line 32 - page 25, column 1, line 8 *