Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0900639

EP0900639 - METHOD OF RECOVERING RESIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Teijin Chemicals, Ltd.
2-2, Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/10]For all designated states
Teijin Chemicals, Ltd.
2-2, Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SHINOMIYA, Hiromasa Teijin Chemicals, Ltd.
2-2, Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome,Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
02 / NAKAHIRO, Hideki Teijin Chemicals, Ltd.
2-2, Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome,Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
03 / NAKADO, Tomohiro Teijin Chemicals, Ltd.
2-2, Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome,Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
 [2003/01]
Former [1999/10]01 / SHINOMIYA, Hiromasa-Teijin Chemicals, Ltd.
2-2, Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome,Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
02 / NAKAHIRO, Hideki-Teijin Chemicals, Ltd.
2-2, Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome,Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
03 / NAKADO, Tomohiro-Teijin Chemicals, Ltd.
2-2, Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome,Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
Representative(s)Albrecht, Thomas , et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/44]Albrecht, Thomas, Dr. , et al
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [1999/10]Weisert, Annekäte, Dipl.-Ing. Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Kraus Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date97915702.110.04.1997
[1999/10]
WO1997JP01239
Priority number, dateJP1996009797019.04.1996         Original published format: JP 9797096
[1999/10]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9739868
Date:30.10.1997
Language:EN
[1997/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0900639
Date:10.03.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.1997
[1999/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0900639
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/25]
Search report(s)International search reportJP30.10.1997
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP18.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:B29B17/02, B29B17/00, B03B9/06, B29C63/00
[2000/27]
Former International [1999/10]B29B17/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1999/10]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM WIEDERGEWINNEN VON HARZEN[1999/10]
English:METHOD OF RECOVERING RESIN[1999/10]
French:PROCEDE DE RECUPERATION DE RESINE[1999/10]
Entry into regional phase15.10.1998Translation filed 
15.10.1998National basic fee paid 
15.10.1998Search fee paid 
15.10.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
15.10.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.08.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
15.10.1998Examination requested  [1999/10]
02.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.04.2003Fee for grant paid
02.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
06.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
09.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
08.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR18.06.2003
IT18.06.2003
[2008/07]
Former [2006/14]FR18.06.2003
Documents cited:Search[AP]WO9612598  (TEIJIN CHEMICALS LTD [JP], et al) [AP] 1-27 * see abstract *;
 [A]US5214072  (FENNHOFF GERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-27 * column 2, lines 11-15,44-55; examples 1-3 *;
 [AP]EP0761416  (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [AP] 1-27 * claim 1 *;
 [A]DE4306348  (SPITTEL MICHAEL [DE]) [A] 1-27 * claims 1-23 *;
 [A]US5220754  (TAYEBI AMAD [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * column 1, lines 7-13,39-42; figure 12 *;
 [AP]DE19531886  (BASF MAGNETICS GMBH [DE]) [AP] 1-27 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0570600  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-27 * claim 1 *
International search[A]WO9401491  (HELVEREP SA [CH], et al);
 [A]JPH05200379  (BAYER AG);
 [A]JPH07256639  (TEIJIN LTD, et al);
 [A]JPH05345321  (TEIJIN CHEMICALS LTD);
 [A]JPH0663942  (TEIJIN CHEMICALS LTD);
 [A]JPH07205154  (TEIJIN LTD, et al);
 [A]JPH07286064  (TEIJIN ENG, et al);
 [A]WO9406608  (WITT GEORG [DE])