Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0888064

EP0888064 - IMPROVED BAGELS MADE FROM FROZEN BAGEL SHAPES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 25.04.2007  [2007/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Einstein/Noah Bagel Corp.
14123 Denver West Parkway
Golden, CO 80401 / US
[2002/39]
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
Einstein Bros. Bagels, Inc.
14123 Denver West Parkway
Golden, CO 80401 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SAVELLI, Ronald
5 Lindenwood Lane
Littleton, CO 80127 / US
[1999/01]
Representative(s)Goodenough, Nigel , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]Goodenough, Nigel , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date97915978.704.03.1997
[1999/01]
WO1997US04081
Priority number, dateUS1996061347211.03.1996         Original published format: US 613472
[1999/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9733481
Date:18.09.1997
Language:EN
[1997/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0888064
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.1997
[1999/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0888064
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.09.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:A21D10/00, A21D6/00, A21D8/02, A21D13/00
[2000/18]
Former International [1999/01]A21D10/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/01]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE BAGELS AUS GEFRORENEN BAGELFORMEN[1999/01]
English:IMPROVED BAGELS MADE FROM FROZEN BAGEL SHAPES[1999/01]
French:BAGELS AMELIORES REALISES A PARTIR DE FORMES DE BAGELS CONGELES[1999/01]
Entry into regional phase09.10.1998National basic fee paid 
09.10.1998Search fee paid 
09.10.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
09.10.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.05.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
09.10.1998Examination requested  [1999/01]
23.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2002Fee for grant paid
03.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
08.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.09.2002
BE25.09.2002
CH25.09.2002
FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
LI25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
DK25.12.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
[2007/17]
Former [2005/21]AT25.09.2002
BE25.09.2002
CH25.09.2002
FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
LI25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/04]AT25.09.2002
BE25.09.2002
CH25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
LI25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2003/48]AT25.09.2002
BE25.09.2002
CH25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
LI25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/39]AT25.09.2002
CH25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
LI25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/31]AT25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/30]GR25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/29]GR25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/20]GR25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
Former [2003/14]SE25.12.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]US4487786  (JUNGE RICHARD C [US]) [A] 1,24,31,35 * column 4, lines 9-21,62-68 *;
 [A]US5225222  (CHA ALICE S [US], et al) [A] 1,24,31,35 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 15 * * examples 1,2 * * claims 1,3,4,12,13 *;
 [A]US4657769  (PETROFSKY DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 39 * * claim 1 *
International search[Y]US5346715  (FERTEL ROBERT [US]);
 [Y]US4657769  (PETROFSKY DAVID [US], et al)