Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0910406

EP0910406 - RECOMBINANT CANINE HERPESVIRUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.10.2007
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.11.2007  [2007/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merial Limited
P.O.Box 327 Sandringham House Sandringham Avenue Harlow Business Park
Harlow, Essex CM19 5QA / GB
[2007/17]
Former [2002/22]For all designated states
Heska Corporation
1613 Prospect Parkway
Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US
Former [1999/17]For all designated states
Heska Corporation
1825 Sharp Point Drive
Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HAANES, Elizabeth, J.
P.O. Box 780
Boulder, CO 80306 / US
02 / FRANK, Rexann, A.
10317 North County Road 13
Wellington, CO 80549 / US
[1999/17]
Representative(s)Harding, Charles Thomas , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/17]Harding, Charles Thomas , et al
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2002/22]Evens, Paul Jonathan , et al
Maguire Boss, 5 Crown Street
St. Ives, Cambridge PE27 5EB / GB
Former [1999/17]Targett, Kenneth Stanley
48 Meadowsweet Way
Horton Heath, Hampshire SO50 7PD / GB
Application number, filing date97915994.414.02.1997
[1999/17]
WO1997US04115
Priority number, dateUS1996060201015.02.1996         Original published format: US 602010
[1999/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9729772
Date:21.08.1997
Language:EN
[1997/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0910406
Date:28.04.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.1997
[1999/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0910406
Date:06.12.2006
Language:EN
[2006/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.08.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/245, C12N7/01, C12N5/00, C07K1/00, C07K16/00, C07K14/03, C12N15/38
[2000/02]
Former International [1999/17]A61K39/245, C12N7/01, C12N5/00, C07K1/00, C07K16/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/17]
TitleGerman:REKOMBINANTE HUNDE-HERPESVIREN[2006/13]
English:RECOMBINANT CANINE HERPESVIRUSES[1999/17]
French:HERPESVIRUS CANINS RECOMBINES[1999/17]
Former [1999/17]REKOMBINANTE KANINCHEN-HERPESVIREN
Entry into regional phase24.08.1998National basic fee paid 
24.08.1998Search fee paid 
24.08.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
24.08.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.09.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
24.08.1998Examination requested  [1999/17]
28.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
05.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.08.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
16.10.2006Fee for grant paid
16.10.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.09.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/46]
Request for further processing for:16.10.2006Request for further processing filed
16.10.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.10.2006Decision despatched
25.01.2006Request for further processing filed
25.01.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.02.2006Decision despatched
30.07.2004Request for further processing filed
30.07.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.08.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
14.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200610   M06   Fee paid on   14.08.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9526751  (VIROGENETICS CORP [US]) [A] 2-31 * page 15 - page 19 * * page 33 - page 46; examples 1-11 *;
 [AD]  REMOND M ET AL, "GENE ORGANIZATION IN THE UL REGION AND INVERTED REPEATS OF THE CANINE HERPESVIRUS GENOME", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY,GB,SOCIETY FOR GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY, READING, (1996), vol. 77, no. PART 01, ISSN 0022-1317, page 37-48, XP000543180 [AD] 2-31 * page 37 - page 38, column L * * page 41; figure 2 * * page 42 - page 43; table 3 * * page 44; figure 2 * * page 45 *
 [AD]  REMOND M ET AL, "SEQUENCE OF THE CANINE HERPESVIRUS THYMIDINE KINASE GENE: TAXON-PREFERRED AMINO ACID RESIDUES IN THE ALPHAHERPESVIRAL THYMIDINE KINASES", VIRUS RESEARCH,NL,AMSTERDAM, (1995), vol. 39, ISSN 0168-1702, page 341-354, XP000646056 [AD] 2-31 * page 341 * * page 343; figure 1 * * page 344; figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-1702(95)00089-5
 [PX]  TYACK S G ET AL, "Nucleotide sequence of canine herpesvirus homologues of herpes simplex virus type 1 US2, US3, glycoproteins I and E, US8.5 and US9 genes.", DNA SEQUENCE, (1997) 7 (6) 365-8., XP002122947 [PX] 2-12,15-28 * the whole document *
 [T]  HAANES E J ET AL, "Genomic organization of the canine herpesvirus US region.", VIRUS RESEARCH, (1998 FEB) 53 (2) 151-62., XP002122948 [T] 2-31 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-1702(97)00152-4
 [T]  XUAN X ET AL, "Construction of canine herpesvirus vector expressing foreign genes using a lacZ-TK gene cassette as a double selectional marker.", VIRUS GENES, (1998) 17 (1) 25-32., XP002122949 [T] 2-31 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1008096832738
International search[Y]US5223424  (COCHRAN MARK D [US], et al)
 [Y]  - VIROLOGY, July 1993, Vol. 195, No. 1, LIANG et al., "Identification and Deletion Mutagenesis of the Bovine Herpesvirus 1 dUTPase Gene and Gene Homologous to Herpes Simplex Virus/JL49.5", pages 42-50.,
 [Y]  - ARCH. VIROL., 1993, Vol. 133, No. 1-2, RIGGIO et al., "DNA Sequence of a Gene Cluster in the Equine Herpesvirus-4 Genome Which Contains a Newly Identified Herpesvirus Gene Encoding a Membrane Protein", pages 171-178.,
 [Y]  - J. VIROL., November 1992, Vol. 66, No. 11, PYLES et al., "Herpes Simplex Virus Type 1 dUTPase Mutants are Attenuated for Neurovirulence, Neuroinvasiveness and Reactivation from Latency", pages 6706-6713.,
 [Y]  - J. VIROL., July 1994, Vol. 68, No. 7, PYLES et al., "Mutations in Accessory DNA Replicating Functions Alter the Relative Mutation Frequency of Herpes Simplex Virus Type 1 Strains in Cultured Murine Cells", pages 4514-4524.,