Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0901629

EP0901629 - CARBOHYDRATE-BASED LIGAND LIBRARY, ASSAY AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.10.2002
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 22.10.2008  [2008/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PRINCETON UNIVERSITY
5 New South Building, P.O. Box 36 Princeton
New Jersey 08544 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/11]For all designated states
PRINCETON UNIVERSITY
5 New South Building, P.O. Box 36
Princeton New Jersey 08544 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KAHNE, Daniel, E.
148 Poe Road
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
02 / LOEBACH, Jennifer
55 Clearview Avenue
Princeton, NJ 08544 / US
03 / YAN, Lin
Apartment 1B 20 Prescott Street
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
04 / LIANG, Rui
119 York Drive
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
[1999/18]
Former [1999/11]01 / KAHNE, Daniel, E.
148 Poe Road
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
02 / LOEBACH, Jennifer
55 Clearview Avenue
Princeton, NJ 08544 / US
03 / YAN, Lin
Apartment 1B 20 Prescott Street
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
04 / LIANG, Rui
32-02 Ravens Crest Drive
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US
Representative(s)Lang, Friedrich , et al
Lang & Tomerius
Patentanwälte
Rosa-Bavarese-Strasse 5
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/43]Lang, Friedrich , et al
Lang & Tomerius Patentanwälte Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
Former [2002/33]Lang, Friedrich , et al
Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Postfach 151324
80048 München / DE
Former [2000/30]Lang, Friedrich , et al
Patentanwälte Weber & Heim Bavariaring 29
80336 München / DE
Former [1999/11]Tomerius, Isabel, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte Weber & Heim, Irmgardstrasse 3
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date97916164.321.03.1997
[1999/11]
WO1997US04639
Priority number, dateUS19960015379P21.03.1996         Original published format: US 15379 P
[1999/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9735202
Date:25.09.1997
Language:EN
[1997/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0901629
Date:17.03.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.1997
[1999/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US25.09.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/543, C12N9/00, C07H5/08, C07H15/12, C07H15/14, A61K39/385, C07H1/00
[2000/05]
Former International [1999/11]G01N33/543, C12N9/00, C07H5/08, C07H15/12, C07H15/14, A61K39/385
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/11]
TitleGerman:KOHLENHYDRATBIBLIOTHEK, ASSAY UND METHODE[1999/11]
English:CARBOHYDRATE-BASED LIGAND LIBRARY, ASSAY AND METHOD[1999/11]
French:BIBLIOTHEQUE DE LIGANDS A BASE D'HYDRATES DE CARBONE, DOSAGE ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANTS[1999/11]
Entry into regional phase21.09.1998National basic fee paid 
21.09.1998Search fee paid 
21.09.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.09.1998Examination requested  [1999/11]
28.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/50]
12.07.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200206   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9419360  (UNIV PRINCETON [US]) [X] 1-30 * figures 1-8; claims 1-44,73-80 *;
 [X]EP0601417  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-30 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9503315  (OXFORD GLYCOSYSTEMS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-30 * the whole document *;
 [PX]WO9636627  (GLYCOMED INC [US]) [PX] 1-30 * the whole document *;
 [X]  NICOLAOU K C ET AL, "TOTAL SYNTHESIS OF THE TUMOR-ASSOCIATED LEX FAMILY OF GLYCOSPHINGOLIPIDS", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY,US,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, vol. 112, ISSN 0002-7863, page 3693-3695, XP000601632 [X] 18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00165a084
 [X]  JOHNSTON J N ET AL, "Studies directed toward the total synthesis of polycavernoside A. enantioselective synthesis of the disaccharide component", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, (1995), vol. 36, no. 25, ISSN 0040-4039, page 4341-4344, XP004027848 [X] 18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4039(95)00789-F
 [X]  BAMHAOUD T ET AL, "A NOVEL APPROACH TO THE CONSTRUCTION OF HYDROXYLAMINO INTERGLYCOSIDIC LINKAGES", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS,GB,CHEMICAL SOCIETY. LETCHWORTH, (1992), no. 20, ISSN 0022-4936, page 1494-1496, XP000857310 [X] 18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c39920001494
 [X]  BECKER D ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND UTILIZATION OF SACCHARIDE INTERMEDIATES", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHING COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, (1993), vol. 248, ISSN 0008-6215, page 129-141, XP000857309 [X] 18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0008-6215(93)84121-L
 [X]  S.CAO ET AL., "Phase Transfer Catalyzed Anomeric Nucleophilic Substitutions Occur by an SN2-Type Mechanism.", CARBOHYDRATE LETTERS, (1996), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 27 - 34, XP000856877 [X] 18 * the whole document *
 [PX]  S.KOMBA ET AL., "Synthesis and Biological Activities of Three Sulfates Sialyl Lex Ganglioside Analogues for Clarifying the Real Carbohydrate Ligand Structure of L-Selectin.", BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (199611), vol. 4, no. 11, pages 1833 - 1847, XP000856927 [PX] 18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0968-0896(96)00165-4
International search[YP]US5575324  (HWANG CHARLES [US]);
 [YP]US5510240  (LAM KIT S [US], et al);
 [Y]WO9503315  (OXFORD GLYCOSYSTEMS LTD [GB], et al);
 [Y]WO9518971  (AFFYMAX TECH NV [NL], et al)
 [XP]  - SCIENCE, November 1996, Vol. 274, LIANG R. et al., "Parallel Synthesis and Screening of a Solid Phase Carbohydrate Library", pages 1520-1522.,
 [A]  - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., December 1993, Vol. 90, OHLMEYER M. et al., "Complex Synthetic Chemical Libraries Indexed with Molecular Tags", pages 10922-10926.,