Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0886845

EP0886845 - FUZZY LOGIC-ASSISTED TRAFFIC-RESPONSIVE CONTROL SYSTEM FOR TRAFFIC LIGHT SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.2000
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MIEDEN, Thorsten
Kleinstrasse 23
D-81379 München / DE
02 / BUSCH, Fritz
Johann-Lipp-Strasse 79
D-86415 Mering / DE
[1999/01]
Application number, filing date97916338.311.03.1997
[1999/01]
WO1997DE00471
Priority number, dateDE199610968012.03.1996         Original published format: DE 19609680
[1999/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9734274
Date:18.09.1997
Language:DE
[1997/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0886845
Date:30.12.1998
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.1997
[1998/53]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0886845
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.09.1997
ClassificationInternational:G08G1/08
[1999/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1999/01]
TitleGerman:VERKEHRSABHÄNGIGE STEUERUNG VON VERKEHRS-LICHTSIGNALANLAGEN MIT HILFE VON FUZZY-LOGIK[1999/01]
English:FUZZY LOGIC-ASSISTED TRAFFIC-RESPONSIVE CONTROL SYSTEM FOR TRAFFIC LIGHT SYSTEMS[1999/01]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DEPENDANT DU TRAFIC, DE SYSTEMES DE FEUX DE SIGNALISATION, ASSISTE PAR LOGIQUE FLOU[1999/01]
Entry into regional phase03.09.1998National basic fee paid 
03.09.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.10.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.09.1998Examination requested  [1998/53]
04.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.09.1999Fee for grant paid
17.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR12.01.2000
IT12.01.2000
NL12.01.2000
AT11.03.2000
BE31.03.2000
[2008/07]
Former [2006/14]FR12.01.2000
NL12.01.2000
AT11.03.2000
BE31.03.2000
Former [2003/09]NL12.01.2000
AT11.03.2000
BE31.03.2000
FR09.06.2000
Former [2001/37]AT11.03.2000
BE31.03.2000
FR09.06.2000
Former [2001/11]BE31.03.2000
FR09.06.2000
Former [2001/09]FR09.06.2000
Cited inInternational search[PA]DE19521927  (INST AUTOMATION UND KOMMUNIKAT [DE]) [PA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5357436  (CHIU STEPHEN L [US]) [A] 1 * claim - *;
 [A]DE1940605  (IBM) [A] 1 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 26 * * page 10, line 1 - page 12, line 13; figures 1-5 *
 [PX]  - SAYERS T ET AL, "Traffic responsive signal control using fuzzy logic-a practical modular approach", IEE COLLOQUIUM ON FUZZY LOGIC CONTROLLERS IN PRACTICE (DIGEST NO.1996/200), LONDON, UK, 15 NOV. 1996, LONDON, UK, (1996), pages 5/1 - 4, XP002035546 [PX] 1-8 * the whole document *
 [A]  - FAVILLA J ET AL, "FUZZY TRAFFIC CONTROL: ADAPTIVE STRATEGIES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON FUZZY SYSTEMS, SAN FRANCISCO, MAR. 28 - APR. 1, 1993, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19930328), vol. 1, pages 506 - 511, XP000371467 [A] 1-8 * page 506, column 1, line 1 - page 509, column 1, line L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/FUZZY.1993.327519
 [A]  - HOYER R ET AL, "FUZZY CONTROL OF TRAFFIC LIGHTS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE CONFERENCE ON FUZZY SYSTEMS, ORLANDO, JUNE 26 - 29, 1994, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19940626), vol. 3, pages 1526 - 1531, XP000526905 [A] 1-8 * page 1526, paragraph L - page 1527, paragraph L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/FUZZY.1994.343921
 [A]  - KAUR D ET AL, "FUZZY TRAFFIC LIGHT CONTROLLER", PROCEEDINGS OF THE MIDWEST SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, LAFAYETTE, AUG. 3 - 5, 1994, BAYOUMI M A;JENKINS W K (EDS ), (19940803), VOL. 2, no. SYMP., pages 1507 - 1510, XP000531922 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MWSCAS.1994.519092