Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968238

EP0968238 - MIXED FLUOROCHEMICAL HYDROCARBON CONDENSATES TO IMPART OIL AND WATER REPELLENCY TO A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2004
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 09.12.2009  [2009/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / AUDENAERT, Frans, 3M Belgium Chemical Group
European Business Ctr, Canadastraat 11, Haven 1005
B-2070 Zwijndrecht / BE
02 / COPPENS, Dirk M., 3M Belgium Chemical Group
European Business Ctr, Canadastraat 11, Haven 1005
B-2070 Zwijndrecht / BE
03 / DAMS, Rudolf J., 3M Belgium Chemical Group
European Business Ctr, Canadastraat 11, Haven 1005
B-2070 Zwijndrecht / BE
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Voortmans, Gilbert J.L.
3M Belgium B.V.B.A./S.P.R.L.
Hermeslaan 7
1831 Diegem / BE
[N/P]
Former [2009/50]Voortmans, Gilbert J.L.
3M Europe S.A./N.V. OIPC Hermeslaan 7
1831 Diegem / BE
Former [2000/01]Voortmans, Gilbert J.L.
3M Europe S.A., Hermeslaan 7
1831 Diegem / BE
Application number, filing date97916454.808.04.1997
[2000/01]
WO1997EP01744
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9845345
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968238
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968238
Date:12.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C08G12/40, D06M13/432, D06M15/437
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/01]
TitleGerman:FLUORVERBINDUNG ENTHALTENDE MISCHKONDENSATE ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINES SUBSTRATS ZUR VERLEIHUNG VON WASSER- UND ÖLABWEISENDEN EIGENSCHAFTEN[2000/01]
English:MIXED FLUOROCHEMICAL HYDROCARBON CONDENSATES TO IMPART OIL AND WATER REPELLENCY TO A SUBSTRATE[2000/01]
French:CONDENSATS D'HYDROCARBURES FLUOROCHIMIQUES MELANGES DESTINES A RENDRE UN SUBSTRAT OLEOPHOBE ET HYDROPHOBE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase06.09.1999National basic fee paid 
06.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
06.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
16.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2002Fee for grant paid
11.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.12.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]US4014857  (SCHMOYER RONALD W);
 [A]US3510455  (OLSON MAYNARD H);
 [A]US5292796  (DAMS RUDOLF J [US], et al)
ExaminationDE3133303
 US3362782