blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0976086

EP0976086 - PORTABLE DATA COLLECTION DEVICE WITH VIEWING ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.07.2004
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Symbol Technologies, Inc.
One Symbol Plaza
Holtsville, NY 11742-1300 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/43]For all designated states
SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
One Symbol Plaza
Holtsville, New York 11742-1300 / US
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
METANETICS CORPORATION
Suite 102, 43 Barkley Circle
Fort Myers, FL 33907 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FENG, Chen
5251-22 Red Cedar Drive
Fort Myers, FL 33907 / US
02 / WANG, Ynjiun, P.
5235-17 Red Cedar Drive
Fort Myers, FL 33907 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H., et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H., et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2004/01]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al
Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2003/43]Hector, Annabel Mary, et al
D Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Former [2003/09]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al
Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2000/05]Holmes, Miles Keeton, et al
D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date97917055.227.03.1997
[2000/05]
WO1997US05013
Priority number, dateUS1996062396329.03.1996         Original published format: US 623963
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9737320
Date:09.10.1997
Language:EN
[1997/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976086
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976086
Date:17.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.10.1997
ClassificationIPC:G06K7/10
[2000/05]
CPC:
G06K7/1092 (EP,US); G06K7/10722 (EP,US); G06K7/10732 (EP,US);
G06K7/10881 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [2000/05]
TitleGerman:TRAGBARER DATENSAMMLUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT SICHTVORRICHTUNG[2000/05]
English:PORTABLE DATA COLLECTION DEVICE WITH VIEWING ASSEMBLY[2000/05]
French:DISPOSITIF PORTATIF DE RECUEIL DE DONNEES MUNI D'UN ENSEMBLE DE VISEE[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase29.01.1999National basic fee paid 
29.01.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.01.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.10.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
29.01.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
07.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.06.2003Fee for grant paid
18.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
30.12.1998DE   M01   Fee paid on   29.01.1999
30.12.1998FR   M01   Fee paid on   29.01.1999
30.12.1998GB   M01   Fee paid on   29.01.1999
30.12.1998IE   M01   Fee paid on   29.01.1999
30.12.1998IT   M01   Fee paid on   29.01.1999
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
30.12.1998M01   Fee paid on   29.01.1999
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]JPH03196382  ;
 [A]WO9318478  (NORAND CORP [US]) [A] 1,7,10 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US4716507  (AMES ALAN J [US]) [A] 2 * claim 2 *;
 [A]US5291008  (HAVENS WILLIAM H [US], et al) [A] 4 * claim 3 *;
 [A]EP0671849  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 7,10 * figure 2 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911122), vol. 015, no. 462, Database accession no. (P - 1279), & JP03196382 A 19910827 (NEC HOME ELECTRON LTD) [A] 1,7,8,10-12 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.