Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975294

EP0975294 - ABSORBENT ARTICLE HAVING IMPROVED COMFORT DURING USE BY IMPROVED FIT EVEN WHEN LOADED AND IMPROVED REWET PERFORMANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  23.06.2006
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
Updated state(s): PT
published on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/30]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Former [2002/46]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LAVON, Gary, Dean
7320 Canterbury Court
Middletown, OH 45044 / US
02 / YOUNG, Gerald, Alfred
1101 Hearthstone Drive
Cincinnati, OH 45231 / US
03 / PALUMBO, Gianfranco
Georgenfeld 7
D-61348 Bad Homburg / DE
04 / SCHMIDT, Mattias
Altkoenigweg 3
D-65510 Idstein / DE
05 / EHRNSPERGER, Bruno, Johannes
Am Hopfengarten 19
D-60489 Frankfurt / DE
06 / NEUMANN, Frank
Frankfurter Strasse 120
D-65779 Kelkheim / DE
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Canonici, Jean-Jacques , et al
Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH
Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Canonici, Jean-Jacques , et al
Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date97917664.127.03.1997
[2000/05]
WO1997US05048
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9843579
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975294
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0975294
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/46]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0975294
Date:26.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/15
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:ABSORBIERENDER ARTIKEL MIT VERBESSERTEN TRAGEEIGENSCHAFTEN DURCH BESSEREN SITZ AUCH BEI DURCHFEUCHTUNG UND MIT VERBESSERTEN RÜCKFEUCHTEEIGENSCHAFTEN[2000/05]
English:ABSORBENT ARTICLE HAVING IMPROVED COMFORT DURING USE BY IMPROVED FIT EVEN WHEN LOADED AND IMPROVED REWET PERFORMANCE[2000/05]
French:PRODUIT ABSORBANT PRESENTANT UN CONFORT AMELIORE AU COURS DE L'UTILISATION GRACE A UN MEILLEUR AJUSTEMENT, MEME LORSQU'IL EST CHARGE, ET PRESENTANT DES PERFORMANCES DE REMOUILLAGE AMELIOREES[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase27.09.1999National basic fee paid 
27.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
22.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.05.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
04.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.09.2002Fee for grant paid
04.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP02008172.5  / EP1236454
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.07.2003   
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Romare, Laila Anette
Zacco Sweden AB
Torggatan 8
Box 142
401 22 Göteborg / SE
 [N/P]
Former [2003/38]
Opponent(s)01  24.07.2003   
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Romare, Laila Anette
Albihns Göteborg AB Box 142
401 22 Göteborg / SE
18.09.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.01.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.06.2005Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
03.06.2005Date of oral proceedings
20.06.2005Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.06.2005Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.10.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
21.10.2005Fee for printing new specification paid
Request for further processing for:13.05.2002Request for further processing filed
13.05.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.05.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.11.2002
CH13.11.2002
FI13.11.2002
GR13.11.2002
LI13.11.2002
DK13.02.2003
IE27.03.2003
LU27.03.2003
PT27.03.2003
[2008/29]
Former [2007/17]AT13.11.2002
CH13.11.2002
FI13.11.2002
GR13.11.2002
LI13.11.2002
DK13.02.2003
IE27.03.2003
LU27.03.2003
PT15.10.2004
Former [2005/20]AT13.11.2002
CH13.11.2002
FI13.11.2002
GR13.11.2002
LI13.11.2002
IE27.03.2003
LU27.03.2003
PT15.10.2004
Former [2004/39]AT13.11.2002
CH13.11.2002
FI13.11.2002
GR13.11.2002
LI13.11.2002
IE27.03.2003
LU27.03.2003
Former [2004/15]AT13.11.2002
CH13.11.2002
FI13.11.2002
GR13.11.2002
LI13.11.2002
IE27.03.2003
Former [2003/43]AT13.11.2002
CH13.11.2002
FI13.11.2002
GR13.11.2002
LI13.11.2002
Former [2003/39]AT13.11.2002
CH13.11.2002
GR13.11.2002
LI13.11.2002
Former [2003/37]AT13.11.2002
GR13.11.2002
Former [2003/20]GR13.11.2002
Cited inInternational search[E]EP0797968  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [E] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0631768  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1 * page 19, line 39 - line 57 *;
 [D]EP0640330  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]);
 [A]EP0422504  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3; example 1; claim 1 *;
 [DA]US4994037  (BERNARDIN LEO J [US]) [DA] 1 * figures 10-13 *
OppositionDE2012758
 WO9615748
 WO9621474