Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972187

EP0972187 - SEPARATION OF CHARGED PARTICLES BY A SPATIALLY AND TEMPORALLY VARYING ELECTRIC FIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.04.2004  [2004/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Curagen Corporation
322 East Main Street
Branford, CT 06405 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Curagen Corporation
322 East Main Street
Brandford, CT 06405 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BADER, Joel, S.
Apartment 2A 12 Academy Street
New Haven, Connecticut 06511 / US
02 / ROTHBERG, Jonathan, M.
45B Cocheco Avenue
Branford, CT 06405 / US
03 / DEEM, Michael, W.
24 Highland Avenue 14
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
04 / MULHERN, Gregory, T.
Apartment 1, 45 Harrison Avenue
Branford, CT 06405 / US
05 / WENT, Gregory, T.
25 Scotland Avenue
Madison, CT 06443 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Darby, David Thomas , et al
Abel & Imray, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Darby, David Thomas , et al
Abel & Imray, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
Application number, filing date97917713.626.03.1997
[2000/03]
WO1997US05172
Priority number, dateUS1996062334627.03.1996         Original published format: US 623346
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9736171
Date:02.10.1997
Language:EN
[1997/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972187
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.1997
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US02.10.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/26, G01N27/447
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:TRENNUNG VON GELADENEN TEILCHEN DURCH EIN RÄUMLICH UND ZEITLICH VERÄNDERLICHES ELEKTRISCHES FELD[2000/03]
English:SEPARATION OF CHARGED PARTICLES BY A SPATIALLY AND TEMPORALLY VARYING ELECTRIC FIELD[2000/03]
French:SEPARATION DE PARTICULES CHARGEES PAR UN CHAMP ELECTRIQUE VARIABLE DANS L'ESPACE ET DANS LE TEMPS[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase15.10.1998National basic fee paid 
15.10.1998Search fee paid 
15.10.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
15.10.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.10.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
15.10.1998Examination requested  [2000/03]
01.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/15]
06.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200307   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0645169  (AJDARI ARMAND [FR], et al) [X] 1-106 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9422583  (BRITISH TECH GROUP [GB], et al) [A] 1,2,5,6,15,17,21,26,46,48,51,57,62,67,69,70,75,93,100,107 * page 12, lines 15-23; figure 11 * * page 13, line 24 - page 21, line 15; figures 16,18 *;
 [A]US5348636  (SLATER GARY [CA], et al) [A] 116-119 * column 22, line 45 - column 24, line 2 * * column 21, lines 23-30 *
 [A]  ASTUMIAN R D ET AL, "Fluctuation driven ratchets: molecular motors", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, 14 MARCH 1994, USA, vol. 72, no. 11, ISSN 0031-9007, pages 1766 - 1769, XP002113695 [A] 1-115

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevLett.72.1766
International search[X]EP0645169  (AJDARI ARMAND [FR], et al)
 [X]  - NATURE, 11 August 1994, Vol. 370, ROUSSELET et al., "Directional Motion of Brownian Particles Induced by a Periodic Assymetric Potential", pages 446-448.,
 [A]  - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., May 1991, Vol. 88, ADARI et al., "Free-Flow Electrophoresis with Trapping by a Transverse Inhomogeneous Field", pages 4468-4471.,