Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0892705

EP0892705 - NOVEL ELASTOMER COMPOSITES, METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.09.2008
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2019New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CABOT CORPORATION
Two Seaport Lane
Suite 1300
Boston, Massachusetts 02210-2019 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/43]For all designated states
CABOT CORPORATION
Two Seaport Lane, Suite 1300
Boston, Massachusetts 02210-2019 / US
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
CABOT CORPORATION
Two Seaport Lane, Suite 1300
Boston, Massachusetts 02210-2019 / US
Former [1999/04]For all designated states
CABOT CORPORATION
75 State Street
Boston, MA 02109-1806 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHUNG, Bin
12 Deacon Drive
Nashua, NH 03063 / US
02 / MABRY, Melinda, A.
65 Algonquin Road
Newton, MA 02167 / US
03 / RUMPF, Frederick, H.
Five Copley Place
Billerica, MA 01821 / US
04 / PODOBNIK, Ivan, Z.
Seven Foxglove Court
Nashua, NH 03062 / US
05 / WESTVEER, Scott, A.
65 Lakeshore Drive North
Westford, MA 01886 / US
06 / MORGAN, Allan, C.
101R Old Essex Road
Manchester, MA 01944 / US
07 / ANDREWS, Malcolm, J.
3112 Rolling Glen
Bryan, TX 77801 / US
[1999/04]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/46]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2005/29]Trueman, Lucy Petra , et al
Barker Brettell, 138 Hagley Road, Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Former [1999/04]Attfield, Donald James
Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date97917754.025.03.1997
[1999/04]
WO1997US05276
Priority number, dateUS1996062516301.04.1996         Original published format: US 625163
US1996002047913.06.1996         Original published format: US 20479
[1999/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9736724
Date:09.10.1997
Language:EN
[1997/43]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0892705
Date:27.01.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.1997
[1999/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0892705
Date:22.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:B29C67/24, B29C70/58, C08K3/04, C08L21/00
[2002/45]
Former International [1999/04]B29B15/04, B01F5/02, C08C1/15, C08J3/215, C08K3/36
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/04]
TitleGerman:NEUE ELASTOMERE VERBUNDWERKSTOFFE, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG DERSELBEN[1999/04]
English:NOVEL ELASTOMER COMPOSITES, METHOD AND APPARATUS[1999/04]
French:NOUVEAUX MATERIAUX COMPOSITES ELASTOMERES, ET PROCEDE ET APPAREIL S'Y RAPPORTANT[1999/04]
Entry into regional phase23.10.1998National basic fee paid 
23.10.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
23.10.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.10.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.10.1998Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.10.1998Examination requested  [1999/04]
02.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2008Fee for grant paid
03.09.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.07.2009  24.07.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Bridgestone Corporation
Toda Building
7-1 Kyobashi 1-chome
Chou-ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
Opponent's representative
Altenburg, Udo
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2009/35]
Opponent(s)01  16.07.2009   
Bridgestone Corporation
Toda Building 7-1 Kyobashi 1-chome Chou-ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
Opponent's representative
Altenburg, Udo
Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
26.08.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.05.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.04.2013Date of oral proceedings
08.05.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.05.2019Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
22.05.2019Date of oral proceedings
29.07.2019Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.07.2019Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.11.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
Appeal following opposition18.07.2013Appeal received No.  T1626/13
18.09.2013Statement of grounds filed
17.05.2018Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
05.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
04.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
04.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
06.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
05.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
10.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI22.10.2008
GR23.01.2009
MC31.03.2009
AT25.03.2016
IE25.03.2016
LU25.03.2016
DK31.03.2016
GB24.03.2017
ES26.03.2017
PT05.04.2017
[2017/38]
Former [2017/36]FI22.10.2008
GR23.01.2009
MC31.03.2009
AT25.03.2016
IE25.03.2016
LU25.03.2016
DK31.03.2016
GB24.03.2017
ES26.03.2017
Former [2017/17]FI22.10.2008
GR23.01.2009
MC31.03.2009
AT25.03.2016
IE25.03.2016
LU25.03.2016
Former [2017/07]FI22.10.2008
GR23.01.2009
MC31.03.2009
IE25.03.2016
LU25.03.2016
Former [2016/47]FI22.10.2008
GR23.01.2009
MC31.03.2009
LU25.03.2016
Former [2011/25]FI22.10.2008
GR23.01.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2010/05]FI22.10.2008
MC31.03.2009
Former [2009/30]FI22.10.2008
Cited inInternational search[XY]DE1063364  (COLUMBIAN CARBON) [X] 1-7,60,99,113 * column 1, line 50 - column 4, line 16; claims 1,2 * [Y] 8-50,52,56,61-63,100-104,106-110;
 [Y]US4265939  (TEBBENS KLAAS, et al) [Y] 8-50,52,56,61-63 * figures 1-5; claims 1,3,8-10 *;
 [Y]US4303569  (GUEURAK NUR, et al) [Y] 8-50,52,56,61-63 * column 4, line 31 - line 38; figures 1,3; example 1; claim 1 *;
 [Y]US3403121  (NELSON HARE PAUL) [Y] 31-37 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP0570715  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [Y] 100-103 * claim 1 *;
 [Y]JPS5753340  ;
 [Y]US5264290  (TOUCHET PAUL [US], et al) [Y] 106 * example 1 *;
 [Y]US5119927  (BRUEGGEMANN MICHAEL [DE]) [Y] 107 * claims 1,8 *;
 [PY]US5558316  (LEE HYOSANG [KR], et al) [PY] 108 * claim 1 *;
 [Y]JPH05262918  ;
 [Y]US4917211  (YAMADA TAKAO [JP], et al) [Y] 110 * claims 13,14,17 *;
 [A]US1611278  (PETERSEN AUGUST H) [A] 1 * page 1, line 86 - line 97 * * page 2, line 46 - line 22 *;
 [A]EP0287392  (LUMINIS PTY LTD [AU]) [A] 8,29,30,39-41,43,51,52,61-63 * column 8, line 56 - column 9, line 5; figures 2A,2D,2E *;
 [A]DE1620918  (INST CIEZKIEJ SYNTEZY ORGA) [A] 40,51 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 13; figure 2 *;
 [A]US4744744  (SUGIMORI TERUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 40 * figures 8,9,11 *;
 [A]US4914186  (MISS HELMUT [DE], et al) [A] 46,49 * column 3, line 23 - line 30; figure 1 *;
 [A]CH581493  (ESCHER WYSS AG) [A] 53-55 * figures 1,2 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820710), vol. 006, no. 126, Database accession no. (M - 142), & JP57053340 A 19820330 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 104 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 45, Database accession no. 93-357278, XP002036310 & JPH05262918 A 19931012 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [Y] 109 * abstract *